Hess v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: R. Rhonda Hess and Rhonda R. Hess
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv02431
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Kramer Marriott on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Marriott, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rhonda R. Hess. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/9/2019, answer due 3/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Safa, Cyrus)
December 28, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MMM)
December 27, 2018 Case assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MMM)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by R. Rhonda Hess. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5373887) by R. Rhonda Hess. Proof of service due by 3/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hess v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Michael Kramer Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. Rhonda Hess
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda R. Hess
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?