Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.170.107.43

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.170.107.43
Case Number: 2:2019cv00144
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Plaintiff shall attach a copy of this Order to any Rule 45 subpoena issued pursuant to this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena; filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #2 Declaration of Greg Lanksy, #3 Declaration of John S. Pasquale, #4 Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Proposed Order) (Sutehall, Kevin)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/29/2019. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
January 25, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (JM)
January 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC added. (Sutehall, Kevin)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.170.107.43 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5405042) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Proof of service due by 4/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sutehall, Kevin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.170.107.43
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 70.170.107.43
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mark J. Connot
Represented By: Kevin M Sutehall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?