Malone v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Bonni L Malone
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00150
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 1130 0001 5956 7268 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 1130 0001 5956 7251 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Michael Kramer Marriott on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Marriott, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Summons Issued as to USA. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 1/30/2019, answer due 3/31/2019. (MR)
January 30, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/30/2019. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
January 29, 2019 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipt(s) 7018 1130 0001 5956 7268 and 7018 1130 0001 5956 7251 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA re #4 Complaint. (MR)
January 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #4 Complaint. (cc: AUSA summons & #4 Complaint to USM - MR)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Bonni L Malone. Proof of service due by 4/29/2019. (MR)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS that #1 Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED with the caveat that the fees shall be paid if recovery is made. The Clerk of Court shall file the Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
January 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Bonni L Malone. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MR)
January 25, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malone v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonni L Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Michael Kramer Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?