Manigault v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Camaron Manigault
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00162
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gina Tomaselli on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Tomaselli, Gina)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Amended Complaint. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 3/1/2019, answer due 4/30/2019. (ADR)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM - cc: USM)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER The Clerk of Court shall ISSUE SUMMONS. Plaintiff shall SERVE the Commissioner by sending a copy of the summons and Amended Complaint by certified mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Camaron Manigault. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 5/22/2019.(Safa, Cyrus)
January 31, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Camaron Manigault. (JM)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; SCREENING ORDER. The Complaint is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Clerk shall file the Complaint, but shall not issue Summons. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/31/2019. (copy of complaint sent to P)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 28, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (RFJ)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Camaron Manigault. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Camaron Manigault. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manigault v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Gina Tomaselli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Camaron Manigault
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Gerald Welt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?