Barna Capital Group LTD v. Shiping et al
Plaintiff: BARNA CAPITAL GROUP LTD
Defendant: MEGA CONVENTION GROUP LIMITED, TIANJIN CALISTAR AUTOMALL OPERATION MANAGEMENT CO., LTD., MENG DONG, CALISTAR AUTOMOBILE SALES AND SERVICES, LTD, TONG SHIPING, WORLD VAST INTERNATIONAL ENTERPRISE LIMITED, LV FUQUI, HOWARD BARTH, YU JUN, LILI YANG, BAI SHAOHUA, TIANJIN CALISTAR INDUSTRIAL COMPANY, LTD, CHINA AUTO LOGISTICS, INC., TIANJIN BOHAI CAR SUPPLY CHAIN MANAGEMENT CO. LTD, LISI GROUP (HOLDINGS) LTD, CHENG WEIHONG, XINWEI WANG, TIANJIN BINHAI CAR CITY, LTD, MIGHTY MARK INVESTMENTS, Tianjin Calistar Industrial Company, LTD., Tianjin Bohai Car Supply Chain Management Co. LTD. and Calistar Automobile Sales and Services, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00169
Filed: January 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to respond to #6 and #9 Motions to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Barna Capital Group LTD. (Kerr, Jason) .
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Barna Capital Group LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Kerr, Jason)
March 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Barna Capital Group LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jason Kerr) (Kerr, Jason)
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Meng Dong, LV Fuqui, Yu Jun, Bai Shaohua, Tong Shiping, Xinwei Wang, Cheng Weihong, Lili Yang. Replies due by 3/20/2019. (Gayan, Michael)
February 28, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Meng Dong, LV Fuqui, Yu Jun, Bai Shaohua, Tong Shiping, Xinwei Wang, Cheng Weihong, Lili Yang. (Gayan, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Barna Capital Group LTD. Responses due by 3/13/2019. (Kerr, Jason)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul Walsen and approving Designation of Local Counsel Rory T Kay. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/26/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission for Nicole C. Mueller to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Rory T. Kay. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/26/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Nicole Claire Mueller and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Rory T. Kay (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5441766) by Nominal Defendant China Auto Logistics, Inc.. (Kay, Rory)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Paul J. Walsen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Rory T. Kay (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5441753) by Nominal Defendant China Auto Logistics, Inc.. (Kay, Rory)
February 14, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for Judicial Notice re #9 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Meng Dong, LV Fuqui, Yu Jun, Bai Shaohua, Tong Shiping, Xinwei Wang, Cheng Weihong, Lili Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Gayan, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Meng Dong, LV Fuqui, Yu Jun, Bai Shaohua, Tong Shiping, Xinwei Wang, Cheng Weihong, Lili Yang. Responses due by 2/28/2019. (Gayan, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 JOINDER to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Meng Dong, LV Fuqui, Yu Jun, Bai Shaohua, Tong Shiping, Xinwei Wang, Cheng Weihong, Lili Yang. (Gayan, Michael)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by China Auto Logistics, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Bright Praise Enterprises Limited, Other Affiliate Choi Chun Leung Robert for China Auto Logistics, Inc. added. (Kay, Rory)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Nominal Defendant China Auto Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 2/28/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/31/2019. (Kay, Rory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Meng Dong, LV Fuqui, Yu Jun, Bai Shaohua, Tong Shiping, Xinwei Wang, Cheng Weihong, Lili Yang. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gayan, Michael)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Meng Dong, LV Fuqui, Yu Jun, Bai Shaohua, Tong Shiping, Xinwei Wang, Cheng Weihong, Lili Yang. (Gayan, Michael)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Ronald F. Price, Christopher S. Burrichter, Joni Jacobsen, Nicole C. Mueller, Paul Walsen, to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/15/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 1/29/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/13/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 29, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (MMM)
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number a-18-772474-b, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5408105) by TONG SHIPING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U)(Gayan, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barna Capital Group LTD v. Shiping et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGA CONVENTION GROUP LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIANJIN CALISTAR AUTOMALL OPERATION MANAGEMENT CO., LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENG DONG
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CALISTAR AUTOMOBILE SALES AND SERVICES, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TONG SHIPING
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WORLD VAST INTERNATIONAL ENTERPRISE LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV FUQUI
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD BARTH
Represented By: Joni Jacobsen
Represented By: Christopher S. Burrichter
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Barr
Represented By: Lee I. Iglody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YU JUN
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LILI YANG
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAI SHAOHUA
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIANJIN CALISTAR INDUSTRIAL COMPANY, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHINA AUTO LOGISTICS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIANJIN BOHAI CAR SUPPLY CHAIN MANAGEMENT CO. LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISI GROUP (HOLDINGS) LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHENG WEIHONG
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XINWEI WANG
Represented By: Michael J Gayan
Represented By: J. Randall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIANJIN BINHAI CAR CITY, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIGHTY MARK INVESTMENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tianjin Calistar Industrial Company, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tianjin Bohai Car Supply Chain Management Co. LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calistar Automobile Sales and Services, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARNA CAPITAL GROUP LTD
Represented By: Ronald F. Price
Represented By: John P. Aldrich
Represented By: Jason M. Kerr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?