Atturo Tire Corp v. Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc.

Plaintiff: Atturo Tire Corp
Defendant: Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00198
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Strike #22 Answer to Complaint, by Plaintiff Atturo Tire Corp. Responses due by 4/11/2019. (Olsen, Eric)
March 8, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Cooper Tire & Rubber Company for Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc. added. (McCue, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/21/2019.(McCue, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #6 Atturo's motion for preliminary injunction be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/7/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #18 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc. answer due 3/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 26, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, by Plaintiff Atturo Tire Corp. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Mathis, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2, #4 Exhibit Ex 3, #5 Exhibit Ex 4, #6 Exhibit Ex 5, #7 Exhibit Ex 6, #8 Exhibit Ex 7, #9 Exhibit Ex 8, #10 Exhibit Ex 9, #11 Exhibit Ex 10, #12 Exhibit Ex 11, #13 Exhibit Ex 12, #14 Exhibit Ex 13, #15 Exhibit Ex 14, #16 Exhibit Ex 15, #17 Exhibit Ex 16, #18 Exhibit Ex 17, #19 Exhibit Ex 18, #20 Exhibit Ex 19, #21 Exhibit Ex 20, #22 Exhibit Ex 21, #23 Exhibit Ex 22, #24 Exhibit Ex 23, #25 Exhibit Ex 24, #26 Exhibit Ex 25, #27 Exhibit Ex 26) (Olsen, Eric)
February 25, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST STIPULATION for Extension of Time re: #1 COMPLAINT ; filed by Defendant Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc.. (McCue, Michael) Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Michael J. McCue. Court corrected entry on 2/26/2019 (RFJ).
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, by Defendant Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc.. Replies due by 2/26/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ken G. Warner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Declaration Michael J. McCue, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Exhibit G) (McCue, Michael)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #2 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brian C Bianco for Atturo Tire Corp and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/12/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julia R Lissner for Atturo Tire Corp and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/12/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #4 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stacy A Baim for Atturo Tire Corp and approving Designation of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/12/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Atturo Tire Corp. Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc. served on 2/4/2019, answer due 2/25/2019. (Olsen, Eric)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc. re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #4 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Atturo Tire Corp. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Olsen, Eric)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #3 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Atturo Tire Corp. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Olsen, Eric)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #2 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Plaintiff Atturo Tire Corp. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Olsen, Eric)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 2/7/2019. Re: #2 , #3 and #4 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. Motions were not properly completed. Every question must be answered. All three (3) motions are missing information for question #8 as required by LR IA 11-2 (b)(3). Attorney Eric R. Olsen is advised to file a corrected Verified Petition in accordance with LR IA 11-2 within 5 days of this Minute Order. Attorney is also advise to use only the correct event Notice of Corrected Image/Document pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and properly link newly filed Notice to the appropriate documents #2 , #3 and #4 pursuant to LR IC -2-2(d). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RFJ)
February 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Atturo Tire Corp. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Olsen, Eric)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Atturo Tire Corp. Responses due by 2/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Bianco Dec, #2 Exhibit Ex A, #3 Exhibit Ex B, #4 Exhibit Ex C, #5 Exhibit Ex D, #6 Exhibit Ex E, #7 Exhibit Ex F, #8 Exhibit Ex G, #9 Exhibit Ex H, #10 Exhibit Ex I, #11 Exhibit Ex J, #12 Exhibit Ex K, #13 Exhibit Ex L, #14 Exhibit Ex M, #15 Exhibit Ex N, #16 Exhibit Ex O, #17 Exhibit Ex P, #18 Exhibit Ex Q, #19 Exhibit Ex R, #20 Exhibit Ex S, #21 Exhibit Ex T, #22 Exhibit Ex U, #23 Exhibit Ex V, #24 Exhibit Ex W, #25 Exhibit Ex X, #26 Exhibit Ex Y, #27 Exhibit Ex Z, #28 Declaration Matthis Declaration, #29 Exhibit Ex 1, #30 Exhibit Ex 2, #31 Exhibit Ex 3, #32 Exhibit Ex 4, #33 Exhibit Ex 5, #34 Exhibit Ex 6, #35 Exhibit Ex 7, #36 Exhibit Ex 8, #37 Exhibit Ex 9, #38 Exhibit Ex 10, #39 Exhibit Ex 11, #40 Exhibit Ex 12, #41 Exhibit Ex 13, #42 Exhibit Ex 14, #43 Exhibit Ex 15, #44 Exhibit Ex 16, #45 Proposed Order) (Olsen, Eric)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
February 1, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 VIEW Corrected Image #11 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stacy A. Baim and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5414479) by Plaintiff Atturo Tire Corp. (Olsen, Eric) Modified on 2/7/2019 (RFJ).
February 1, 2019 Filing 3 VIEW Corrected Image #10 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Julia R. Lissner and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5414472) by Plaintiff Atturo Tire Corp. (Olsen, Eric) Modified on 2/7/2019 (RFJ).
February 1, 2019 Filing 2 VIEW Corrected Image #9 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brian C. Bianco and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Eric R. Olsen (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5414462) by Plaintiff Atturo Tire Corp. (Olsen, Eric) Modified on 2/7/2019 (RFJ).
February 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc. d/b/a Mickey Thompson Tires & Wheels (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5414416) by Atturo Tire Corp. Proof of service due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2, #4 Exhibit Ex 3, #5 Exhibit Ex 4, #6 Exhibit Ex 5, #7 Exhibit Ex 6, #8 Exhibit Ex 7, #9 Exhibit Ex 8, #10 Exhibit Ex 9, #11 Exhibit Ex 10, #12 Exhibit Ex 11, #13 Exhibit Ex 12, #14 Exhibit Ex 13, #15 Exhibit Ex 14, #16 Exhibit Ex 15, #17 Exhibit Ex 16, #18 Summons)(Olsen, Eric) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atturo Tire Corp v. Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max-Trac Tire Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atturo Tire Corp
Represented By: Eric R. Olsen
Represented By: Brian C Bianco
Represented By: Stacy A Baim
Represented By: Julia Renee Lissner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?