International Payment Advisors, Ltd. v. Paysafe Services US, LLC
Plaintiff: International Payment Advisors, Ltd.
Defendant: Paysafe Services US, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00203
Filed: February 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Patricia L. Glasser is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (RFJ)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Mark D. Kemple to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/13/2019. (no image attached) (RFJ)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Paysafe Services US, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate 1.Global Merchant Advisors, LLC, Other Affiliate 2.Paysafe Services (US) Corp. for Paysafe Services US, LLC added. (Hicks, Jason)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Paysafe Services US, LLC. Responses due by 4/12/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Danny Chazonoff, #2 Declaration of Jason Hicks, #3 Exhibit A - Nevada SOS Results for International Payment Advisors, LTD) (Hicks, Jason) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean Riley and approving Designation of Local Counsel Martin J. Kravitz. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/27/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patricia Glaser and approving Designation of Local Counsel Martin J. Kravitz. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/27/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael Gerst and approving Designation of Local Counsel Martin J. Kravitz. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/27/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time re #1 Complaint. Paysafe Services US, LLC answer due 3/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sean Riley and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Martin J. Kravitz (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5445869) by Plaintiff International Payment Advisors, Ltd.. (Wax, Adam)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Patricia Glaser and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Martin J. Kravitz (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5445864) by Plaintiff International Payment Advisors, Ltd.. (Wax, Adam)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Michael Gerst and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Martin J. Kravitz (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5445856) by Plaintiff International Payment Advisors, Ltd.. (Wax, Adam)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: #1 COMPLAINT; filed by Defendant Paysafe Services US, LLC. (Hicks, Jason) b> Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) by attorney Jason Hicks. Court corrected entry on 2/25/2019 (RFJ).
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by International Payment Advisors, Ltd.. Paysafe Services US, LLC served on 2/6/2019, answer due 2/27/2019. (Wax, Adam)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Paysafe Services US, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued; filed by Plaintiff International Payment Advisors, Ltd.. (Kravitz, Martin)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by International Payment Advisors, Ltd. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate International Payment Advisors, Ltd., Other Affiliate Paysafe Services US, LLC, Other Affiliate Marc Maxwell for International Payment Advisors, Ltd. added. (Wax, Adam)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against International Payment Advisors, Ltd. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5414996) by International Payment Advisors, Ltd.. Proof of service due by 5/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wax, Adam) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Payment Advisors, Ltd. v. Paysafe Services US, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Payment Advisors, Ltd.
Represented By: Patricia L. Glasser
Represented By: Michael Gerst
Represented By: Martin J. Kravitz
Represented By: Sean Riley
Represented By: Adam J. Wax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paysafe Services US, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Kemple
Represented By: Jason Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?