Sousani v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Dikranouhie D. Sousani
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00207
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to Attorney General re #9 Certified Mail Receipt. (JM)
March 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick W Snyder on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Snyder, Patrick)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dikranouhie D. Sousani re #8 Summons Issued as to USA. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (JM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to SSA re #9 Certified Mail Receipt. (JM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT as to SSA (0489); Attorney General (0472) re #6 Amended Complaint, #8 Summons Issued as to USA. (JM)
February 22, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM - cc: USM)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Clerk to serve Summons and Complaint to SSA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Dikranouhie D. Sousani. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 5/22/2019.(Safa, Cyrus)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER STRIKING 4 Amended Complaint. Proposed Amended Complaint due 2/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; The complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (TR)
February 4, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Dikranouhie D. Sousani. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dikranouhie D. Sousani. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sousani v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Patrick W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dikranouhie D. Sousani
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?