Rycroft v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Carolyn G Rycroft
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00225
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick W Snyder on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Snyder, Patrick)
February 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Summons Issued as to USA. US Attorney served on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/21/2019. (MR)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cc: AUSA summons & #4 Complaint to USM - MR)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Carolyn G Rycroft. Proof of service due by 5/14/2019. (MR)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: #1 Plaintiff Carolyn G. Rycroft's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall FILE the Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall ISSUE SUMMONS to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Nevada and DELIVER the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. The Clerk of Court shall also ISSUE SUMMONS to the Commissioner of Social Security and Attorney General of the United States. Rycroft shall SERVE the Commissioner of Social Security by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (TR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Carolyn G Rycroft. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Carolyn G Rycroft. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rycroft v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Patrick W Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn G Rycroft
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?