Baylor v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Shirletta M Baylor
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00231
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tina L. Naicker on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Naicker, Tina)
February 25, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Complaint and #5 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States. (MMM)
February 20, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Complaint. Nancy A. Berryhill served on 2/20/2019, answer due 4/21/2019. (ADR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 2290 0001 8797 0434 re #5 Summons Issued as to USA, #4 Complaint. (ADR)
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS re #4 Complaint and #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (MMM)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (MMM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill (Filing fee $400 - NOT paid, ifp granted) by Shirletta M Baylor. Proof of service due by 5/9/2019.(MMM)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file the Complaint, serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration via certified mail, and issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada, and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall have sixty (60) days from the date of service to file their answer or responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (DKJ)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shirletta M Baylor. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Shirletta M Baylor. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Safa, Cyrus)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baylor v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Tina L. Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirletta M Baylor
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?