Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada v. Cantoran et al
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada
Defendant: Amber Ortega and Jaime Cantoran
Case Number: 2:2019cv00264
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2019 Civil Case Terminated without prejudice as to all Defendants per #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (SLD)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal; filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada. (Humes, Christopher)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/14/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron S. Blazevich.This case has been randomly assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jaime Cantoran, Amber Ortega re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
February 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (SLD)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Loveland, Bryce)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5430857) by Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada. Proof of service due by 5/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons as to Amber Ortega, #3 Summons as to Jaime Cantoran)(Loveland, Bryce) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada v. Cantoran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Ortega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaime Cantoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Teamsters Local 631 Security Fund for Southern Nevada
Represented By: Bryce C. Loveland
Represented By: Christopher M. Humes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?