Syllaba v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Scott Anthony Syllaba
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2019cv00305
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:1383
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 1130 0001 5956 7282 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
March 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT 7018 1130 0001 5956 7275 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (MR)
March 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ben A. Porter on behalf of Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Porter, Ben)
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Summons Issued as to USA. AUSA served on 2/28/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. (MR)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 Certified Mail Receipt(s) 7018 1130 0001 5956 7282 and 7018 1130 0001 5956 7275 for #5 Summons Issued as to USA re #4 Complaint. (MR)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cc: AUSA Summons & #4 Complaint to USM for service - MR)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill by Scott Anthony Syllaba. Proof of service due by 5/27/2019. (MR)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court file #1 -1 the Complaint and serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court issue summons to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Scott Anthony Syllaba. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MR)
February 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syllaba v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Ben A. Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Anthony Syllaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?