Cenegenics v. Ehormones Management LLC
Plaintiff: Cenegenics, LLC
Defendant: Ehormones Management LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00347
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Peggy A Leen
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Stipulation; Ehormones Management LLC answer due 4/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Cenegenics, LLC. (Larsen, Robert)
March 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cenegenics, LLC re #1 Complaint, , #4 Summons Issued . Ehormones Management LLC served on 3/4/2019, answer due 3/25/2019, by Plaintiff Cenegenics, LLC. (Larsen, Robert) Modified event on 3/22/2019 (TR).
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/28/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich.This case has been randomly assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Matthew D. Murphey to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/13/2019. (no image attached) (JM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ehormones Management LLC. (JM)
February 27, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (JM)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cenegenics. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Larsen, Robert)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of A 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Cenegenics. (Larsen, Robert)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cenegenics (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5447644) by Cenegenics. Proof of service due by 5/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A United States Patent and Trademark Office Service Mark for CENEGENICS, #2 Exhibit B Unites States of America Patent and Trademark Office - CENEGENICS, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Proposed)(Larsen, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cenegenics v. Ehormones Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ehormones Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cenegenics, LLC
Represented By: Matthew D. Murphey
Represented By: Wing Yan Wong
Represented By: Robert S. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?