Shattuck v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Johanne Shattuck
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet, Inc. and Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00378
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting #67 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Theodore E. O'Reilly for Defendants and approving Designation of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/8/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting #65 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tarifa Belle Laddon for Defendants and approving Designation of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/8/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Granting #62 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Andrew J Cross and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/5/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting #63 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey J Lowe and approving Designation of Local Counsel Don Sprinmeyer. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/5/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 5, 2019 Filing 68 AFFIDAVIT of Theodore O'Reilly in Support of Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel re #67 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn)
April 5, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Theodore O'Reilly and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5495132) by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn)
April 5, 2019 Filing 66 AFFIDAVIT of Tarifa B. Laddon in Support of Verified Petition and designation of Local Counsel re #65 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn)
April 5, 2019 Filing 65 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tarifa D. Laddon and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel LeAnn Sanders (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5495111) by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn)
April 5, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney LeAnn Sanders on behalf of Defendants Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Sanders, LeAnn)
April 2, 2019 Filing 63 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey J. Lowe and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5489713) by Plaintiff Johanne Shattuck. (Springmeyer, Don)
April 2, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew J. Cross and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Don Springmeyer (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5489705) by Plaintiff Johanne Shattuck. (Springmeyer, Don)
March 21, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE to 59 Minute Order,, by Plaintiff Johanne Shattuck. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Don Springmeyer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10) (Springmeyer, Don)
March 8, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Don Springmeyer on behalf of Plaintiff Johanne Shattuck. (Springmeyer, Don)
March 7, 2019 Filing 59 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/7/2019. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Johanne Shattuck show cause as to why the Court should not dismiss this action for failure to satisfy the diversity jurisdiction requirements set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1332. Specifically, Plaintiff must show that the amount in controversy exceeds $75,000.00. Plaintiff shall have until March 21, 2019, to file a brief, not to exceed ten pages, demonstrating that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this action. Failure to comply with this Order will result in this case being dismissed without prejudice. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ME)
March 7, 2019 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/7/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich.This case has been randomly assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 4, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Andrew J Cross, Jeffrey J Lowe, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L Campbell, Erin Linder Hanig, J Joseph Tanner, John D LaDue, and Stephanie N Russo to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/18/2019. (no image attached) (MR)
March 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MR)
March 4, 2019 Filing 56 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Northern; Case Number 3:17-cv-00445. Original file with transfer order and docket sheet received. (MR)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 GROUP 3 TRANSFER ORDER AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), this case is TRANSFERRED to the District of Nevada, Southern Division. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/22/19. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 9, 2019 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/10/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 10, 2019 Filing 53 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/9/2019 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Navan Ward. Dft appeared by atty Erin Hanig, John Winter. Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for March 4, 2019 at 01:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 1/11/2019 to correct date hearing held (jld). Modified on 2/1/2019 to correct date hearing held (dk). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/7/19. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
November 19, 2018 Filing 51 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 11/15/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter, Erin Hanig. Topics discussed included status of discovery in Groups 6 and 7 and pending motions. Next status conference set for Wednesday, January 9, 2019 at 1:15 p.m. (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) Modified on 12/13/2018 to correct date of hearing (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Concerning Remote Attendance at Status Conference; set for 11/15/2018 01:15 PM EST by telephone can join via conference call. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/9/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(lpw) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER The court GRANTS the parties' joint motion for an extension of time to submit the proposed Remand Group 2 case list (Doc. No. 3723 ) to/including 10/5/2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/1/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the November 8 status conference is RESET for Thursday 11/15/2018 at 1:15 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR SEPTEMBER 19, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for November 8, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. (EST).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/21/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER The court GRANTS the defendants' 3178 Motion to add Attorneys J. Joseph Tanner, Adrienne Franco Busby, Andrew L. Campbell, and Stephanie N. Russo as Co-Liaison Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/19/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Filing 41 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/19/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty N. Ward and B. Fulmer (by phone). Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. Winter, J. LaDue, J. Tanner (in person). The Court hears from parties. Written order to follow. The next Status Conference is set for 11/8/2018 at 1:15 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Adrienne Franco Busby on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie N Russo on behalf of Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Campbell on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 18, 2018 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by J Joseph Tanner on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Orthopedics LLC. (ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the status conference on September 19, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (E.D.T.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER OF TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) AND EXPLANATION TO RECEIVING COURTS Pursuant to the court's prior orders and 28 USC 1404(a), the Clerk of Court is ORDERED TO TRANSFER the cases listed on Exhibit A to the venues agreed upon by the parties and designated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 38 SUGGESTION OF REMAND/EXPLANATION TO TRANSFEROR COURTS Pursuant to 28 USC 1407(a) and Panel Rule 10.1(b), the court suggests that the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation remand the cases listed in Exhibit A to the districts from which they were transferred. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/6/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) (A copy of this Order was emailed to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 9/6/2018) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER VACATING DIRECT FILING PROVISION AND REQUESTING CESSATION OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFERS : Pursuant to the scheduling order issued on 4/23/18 Doc No. 3573 , the provisions in Section III of the 2/15/13 and 3/14/16 Case Mgmt Orders Doc. Nos. 242 and 3096 allowing direct filing in this Court are VACATED effective 9/1/18, and no direct filings will be allowed after that date. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/24/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The parties shall have to and including 8/31/18 to file any objections they may have to: (1) adding 3:13-CV-283, 3:13-CV-1017, 3:14-CV-1264, and 3:14-CV-1271 to the list of cases to be included in Remand Group 1, and (2) transferring all direct-filings to the jurisdictions identified in the proposed list and issuing a suggestion of remand in the cases listed above . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/16/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER The Defendants' ( 3623 in 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG) Consent MOTION to reset Status Conference is GRANTED. The Status Conference is RESET 9/19/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 34 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 7/18/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty A. Davis, N. Ward. Dft appeared by atty E. Hanig, J. LaDue, J. Winter. Topics discussed included status of Group 5 and 6 discovery, the proposed pretrial order on remand, upcoming expert video depositions, pro se cases and pending motions. Following discussion, the court directed plaintiff's counsel to file any motion to enforce settlement in Simpson v. Biomet, 3:16cv466, by Aug 9, 2018. Next status conference set for Aug 27, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. (EDT) before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Remote Attendance Order for July 18, 2018 Status Conference Call in information for the hearing on 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/12/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 32 Docket Annotation: The Dismissal Order entered on 5/29/2018 related to only three member cases, but was inadvertently docketed in all pending member cases. To avoid confusion and correct the error, the original entry [Doc. No. 3593 ] was deleted from the master and all member case dockets, and the order was redocketed in 3:12md2391 [Doc. No. 3596 ] and the related member cases (3:13cv1243, 3:14cv1243, and 3:16cv170).Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 17, 2018 Filing 31 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/17/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty John Winter and John LaDue. The Court hears from parties. A Status Conference is set for 7/18/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the May 17, 2018 status conference.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 5/9/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER - This order activates Group 6 (Exh. A) for case specific discovery purposes and establishes deadlines for winding up the MDL proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/23/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(ksc) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 3560 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties given to and including April 11, 2018 to file the joint proposed scheduling order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 4/10/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER By agreement of the parties, the court established deadlines and a schedule for briefing summary judgment motions in the cases identified in Exhibits A, B, and C to this order. See order for details.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/29/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Plaintiffs Steering Committee's request to take video depositions of its generic expert witnesses, and DIRECTING parties to submit proposed agreed scheduling order by April 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/26/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR MARCH 12, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Next status conference set for Thursday, May 17, 2018 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 3/14/2018. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
March 12, 2018 Filing 24 STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/12/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by attys Jasper Ward (in person), Brenda Fulmer and Ahmad Diab (by phone). Dft appeared by attys Erin Hanig, John LaDue, and John Winter (all in person). The Court hears from parties. Status Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 1:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER Biomets 3388 motions for summary judgment related to the Taper, ReCap, and metal-on-polyethylene devices is DENIED on the merits; Biomets 3390 motions for summary judgment relating to the state-of-the-art defense is DENIED, without prejudice; If the plaintiffs in White v. Biomet (3:16cv115) and Glynn v. Biomet (3:15cv491) wish to take device-specific expert depositions, they should file a motion to that effect within 14 days from the date of this order, and should indicate in that motion whether local counsel will conduct the deposition, with or without the assistance of the Plaintiffs Steering Committee. The plaintiffs in the Price v. Biomet (3:14cv275) and Gearon v. Biomet (3:14cv2099) shall have 14 days from the date of this order to file a motion to amend the scheduling order to allow device-specific expert depositions or, alternatively, a motion for suggestion of remand. If they elect the later, the Plaintiffs Steering Committee should address the effect, if any, remand would have on the plaintiffs obligations under the December 7,2015 Amended Holdback Order 3022 in its response. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/8/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JANUARY 30, 2018 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of the topics discussed and actions taken. The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT)in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/1/18. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 30, 2018 Filing 21 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/30/2018 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty Brenda Fulmer (in person), Ahmed Diab and Justin Presnal (by phone). Dft appeared by atty Erin Linder and John LaDue (in person), John Winter (by phone). The next Status Conference is set for 3/12/2018 at 1:30 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. Written order to follow.(Court Reporter Debra Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Remote Attendance Order for January 30, 2018 Telephonic Status Conference Call-in information for the telephonic status conference on January 30, 2018 at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/25/18. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
December 21, 2017 Filing 19 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 3381 Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Steven R. Schmid; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3382 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet expert David Schroeder; DENYING 3383 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Daniel Schultz, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3384 the Executive Committee's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Andrew I Spitzer, M.D.; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3385 the Executive Committee's Motion to exclude opinions and testimony of Biomet's expert Dr. Kenneth St. John; DENYING 3386 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert Mari Truman; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 3399 Biomet's motion to exclude opinions and testimony of the plaintiffs' expert George S Kantor, M.D. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER On the court's own motion and without objection, the telephonic status conference originally set for 12/19/2017 is now RESET for Tuesday, 1/30/2018 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/18/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the 12/19/2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EST). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: GRANTING #15 Motion to Withdraw #13 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 11/14/17. (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
November 6, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw #13 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing Corp., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 14 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/26/2017 before Judge Robert L Miller, Jr. Pla appeared by atty B. Fulmer. Dft appeared by atty J. LaDue. The Court hears from the parties. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 1:30 PM (EST) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Robert L Miller Jr. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 26, 2017 Filing 13 *** WITHDRAWN PER #16 ORDER *** MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Biomet Manufacturing Corp., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction LLC, Biomet, Inc.. (Hanig, Erin) Modified on 11/14/2017 (jld). [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the Oct. 26, 2017 status conference at 1:30 pm (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/23/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR AUGUST 24, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE Summary of topics discussed and action taken. The next status conference is set for Thursday, October 26, 2017 at 1:30 PM (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/28/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE : Call-in information for the August 24, 2017 status conference at 1:00 pm (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 8/18/2017. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al. (dk) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
August 3, 2017 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Biomet Manufacturing Corp., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc..(Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER FOR JULY 13, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE , Summary of topics discussed and action taken. Parties to submit recommendations regarding procedures for handling new referrals and culminating proceedings by August 17, 2017. Next status conference set for August 24, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. (EDT). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/14/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER CONCERNING REMOTE ATTENDANCE AT STATUS CONFERENCE Call-in information for the July 13, 2017 status conference at 9:30 am (EDT).. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 7/10/17. Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 20, 2017 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Johanne Shattuck. All Defendants. (Lowe PHV, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING ( 3354 ) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG. The defendants shall have to and including 7/31/2017 to file any motion directed at the admissibility of Dr. Kantor's testimony under Federal Rule of Evidence 702. Response due by 8/31/17 and Reply to be filed by 9/11/2017. Signed by Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/15/17. (Copy mailed to pro se party)Associated Cases: 3:12-md-02391-RLM-MGG et al.(jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John D LaDue on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corp., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (LaDue, John) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 9, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Linder Hanig on behalf of Biomet Manufacturing Corp., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC, Biomet, Inc. (Hanig, Erin) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 8, 2017 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (jld) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE by Johanne Shattuck of Related Case (Lowe PHV, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]
June 7, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3269757.), filed by Johanne Shattuck. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, #3 Waiver of Service of Summons Form)(Lowe PHV, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Indiana Northern on 3/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shattuck v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Theodore E. O'Reilly
Represented By: LeAnn Sanders
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Manufacturing Corp
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Theodore E. O'Reilly
Represented By: LeAnn Sanders
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie N Russo
Represented By: Adrienne Franco Busby
Represented By: J Joseph Tanner
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: Andrew L Campbell
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Theodore E. O'Reilly
Represented By: LeAnn Sanders
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet U.S. Reconstruction, LLC
Represented By: Erin Linder Hanig
Represented By: John D LaDue
Represented By: Theodore E. O'Reilly
Represented By: LeAnn Sanders
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johanne Shattuck
Represented By: Andrew J Cross
Represented By: Jeffrey J Lowe PHV
Represented By: Don Springmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?