Watson v. Gittere et al
Petitioner: John Matthias Watson, III and John Matthias Watson
Respondent: Warden Bill Gittere and Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2019cv00379
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT in favor of Respondents and against Petitioner John Matthias Watson without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is Denied. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Death Penalty by John Matthias Watson. (SLD)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that the Clerk shall file the #1 -1 petition for writ of habeas corpus. The petition is Dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is Denied. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/4/2019. Re: #5 Letter Status Request. Due to the large number of inmate civil rights actions pending before the court, the court is unable to respond in writing to individual inquiries regarding the status of the case. Neither the court nor the clerk's office can give legal advice. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - courtesy copy of docket sheet included - SLD)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER requesting status and re #2 Advisory Letter from Petitioner John Matthias Watson (SLD)
March 12, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIPT of Payment: $5.00, receipt number NVLAS062579. (SLD)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-00379-RFB-NJK. (no image attached) (SLD)
March 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Gittere, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:19-cv-00379-GMN-NJK. (SLD)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Petitioner. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus) (SLD)
March 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Gittere et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Bill Gittere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Matthias Watson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Matthias Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?