Gagnon et al v. Matthews et al
Plaintiff: Sherli Gagnon and Ninette Gagnon
Defendant: Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc. and Alfred Matthews, III
Case Number: 2:2019cv00760
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER Denying #8 Amended Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/30/2019. Motions due by 9/30/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendants Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., Alfred Matthews, III Stipulated (Lowry, Michael)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Denying without prejudice #5 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. A renewed discovery plan must be filed by 5/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., Alfred Matthews, III. (Lowry, Michael)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendants Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., Alfred Matthews, III Submitted in Compliance with LR 26-1(b) (Lowry, Michael)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., Alfred Matthews, III. (Lowry, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/3/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/18/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 3, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc., Alfred Matthews, III. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lowry, Michael)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-18-777850-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5533703) by Alfred Matthews, III, Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, #4 Answer to Amended Complaint, #5 Sherli's Interrogatory Responses, #6 Ninette's Interrogatory Responses)(Lowry, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gagnon et al v. Matthews et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Furniture Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan C. Pattillo
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Matthews, III
Represented By: Jonathan C. Pattillo
Represented By: Michael P Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherli Gagnon
Represented By: Adam D Smith
Represented By: Craig A Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ninette Gagnon
Represented By: Adam D Smith
Represented By: Craig A Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?