Laktzian v. Steadfast Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Latoya Laktzian
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00775
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER re #23 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/10/2020. Motions due by 4/9/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #23 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Latoya Laktzian. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Martin, Samantha)
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rule LR IA 6-2. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #23 . The signature block must not begin on a separate page. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #23 . (no image attached) (MMM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 VIEW #25 corrected image to PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Latoya Laktzian (Martin, Samantha)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #21 the parties' Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order is DENIED without prejudice. The parties shall have until 7/3/2019 to submit a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order which complies with LR 26-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Latoya Laktzian (Martin, Samantha)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Olster, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey D. Olster on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Olster, Jeffrey)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report no later than 6/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 28, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Freeman, Robert)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #14 Motion to Remove Attorney Danielle C. Miller from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Latoya Laktzian. Replies due by 5/28/2019.(Martin, Samantha)
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to remove attorney Danielle C. Miller from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Freeman, Robert)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Robert W Freeman, Jr on behalf of Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Freeman, Robert)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Deeming #6 Order to Show Cause Satisfied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #6 Order to Show Cause by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Miller, Danielle)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/9/2019. By Deputy Clerk: M. Johansen.This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Latoya Laktzian that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Martin, Samantha)
May 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. Responses due by 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Miller, Danielle)
May 7, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Miller, Danielle)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why This Action Should Not Be Remanded for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #1 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Danielle C. Miller and Robert W. Freeman. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (MMM)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/6/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/21/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Steadfast Insurance Company. (Freeman, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Steadfast Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Steadfast Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich American Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc, Other Affiliate Zurich Financial Services, Ltd., Other Affiliate Zurich Insurance Company Ltd for Steadfast Insurance Company added. (Freeman, Robert)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Case Number A-19-791934-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5535570) by Steadfast Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freeman, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laktzian v. Steadfast Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steadfast Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Danielle Miller
Represented By: Danielle Colette Miller
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Olster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Laktzian
Represented By: Samantha Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?