Watson v. Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Eric Watson
Defendant: Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00783
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #10 Amended Complaint. Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC answer due 7/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #10 Amended Complaint; filed by Defendant Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC. (Correia, Shauna)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC by Eric Watson. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 9/16/2019.(Foley, Jenny)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC answer due 6/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation, a Delaware corporation, Corporate Parent Bank of America, N.A., Corporate Parent First Data Corporation, a Delaware corporation, Other Affiliate BAC North America Holding Company, Other Affiliate NB Holdings Corp., Other Affiliate BANA Holding Corp for Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC added. (Correia, Shauna)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Correia, Shauna)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #1 Complaint, filed by Defendant Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC. (Correia, Shauna)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Designation of Local Counsel; filed by Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC. (Correia, Shauna)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (ADR)
May 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eric Watson. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5537580) by Eric Watson. Proof of service due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to be issued)(Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson v. Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banc of America Merchant Services, LLC
Represented By: Shauna N. Correia
Represented By: Michael E Stoberski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Watson
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Represented By: Marta D. Kurshumova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?