North v. University Medical Center of Southern Nevada

Plaintiff: Tartanjulia North
Defendant: University Medical Center of Southern Nevada
Case Number: 2:2019cv00789
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/26/2019 at 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. The written evaluation statements shall be submitted directly to Magistrate Koppe's box in the Clerk's Office no later than 3:00 p.m. on 9/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by University Medical Center of Southern Nevada. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/11/2019.(Pitegoff, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against University Medical Center of Southern Nevada by Tartanjulia North. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 9/19/2019.(Trenchak, Philip)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 6/21/2019. The Stipulation moots and vacates the Order for UMC to file a responsive pleading by 6/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to file Amended Complaint by Defendant University Medical Center of Southern Nevada. (Pitegoff, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 VACATED ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. University Medical Center of Southern Nevada answer due 6/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Vacated on 6/14/2019 per #11 Order (SLD).
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tartanjulia North. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Trenchak, Philip)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by University Medical Center of Southern Nevada that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Pitegoff, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 First STIPULATION to Extend time to file Response re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant University Medical Center of Southern Nevada. (Pitegoff, Jeffrey)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tartanjulia North re #2 Summons Issued. University Medical Center of Southern Nevada served on 5/10/2019, answer due 5/31/2019. (Trenchak, Philip)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/8/2019. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich.This case has been randomly assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (SLD)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to University Medical Center of Southern Nevada re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
May 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against University Medical Center of Southern Nevada (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5538194) by Tartanjulia North. Proof of service due by 8/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Trenchak, Philip) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: North v. University Medical Center of Southern Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tartanjulia North
Represented By: Philip J Trenchak
Represented By: Victoria Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Medical Center of Southern Nevada
Represented By: Jeffrey I Pitegoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?