Wolven v. Liang et al

Plaintiff: William Wolven
Defendant: Golden Lion Transportation, Inc. and Sun Ching Liang
Case Number: 2:2019cv00794
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Re: #11 Scheduling Order, Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #10 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/3/2020. Motions due by 2/2/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendants Golden Lion Transportation, Inc., Sun Ching Liang Filed Jointly (Gifford, Devin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Golden Lion Transportation, Inc., Sun Ching Liang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit AOS Golden Lion Transportation dba Lion Express, #3 Exhibit AOS Sun Ching Liang)(Gifford, Devin)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by William Wolven. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Boehrer, David)
May 12, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). Documents #4 and #5 were not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Lucian Greco and Devin Gifford. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning these documents at this time. Do NOT refile the documents. (no image attached) (MMM)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Devin R. Gifford is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (MMM)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Golden Lion Transportation, Inc., Sun Ching Liang. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Greco, Lucian)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Golden Lion Transportation, Inc., Sun Ching Liang. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/24/2019.(Greco, Lucian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/9/2019. By Deputy Clerk: M. Johansen. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/8/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/23/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-792964-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5539326) by Sun Ching Liang, Golden Lion Transportation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit AOS Golden Lion Transportation, #4 Exhibit AOS Sun Ching Liang)(Greco, Lucian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolven v. Liang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Lion Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Lucian Greco, Jr.
Represented By: Devin Ray Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Ching Liang
Represented By: Lucian Greco, Jr.
Represented By: Devin Ray Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Wolven
Represented By: Travis Rich
Represented By: David D. Boehrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?