Padilla v. Sodexo, Inc.

Plaintiff: Rodrigo Padilla
Defendant: Sodexo, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00810
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Case re #11 Motion,, #1 Complaint, by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Declaration of Ellenburg, #3 Exhibit A1 - November 5, 2015 Notice, #4 Exhibit A2 - RPost Report, #5 Exhibit A3 - December 3, 2015 Reminder, #6 Exhibit A4 - December 14, 2015 Reminder, #7 Exhibit B - Declaration of Salmonson, #8 Exhibit B1 - May 31, 2019 Correspondence, #9 Exhibit B2 - June 10, 2019 Email, #10 Exhibit B3- June 17, 2019 Email) (Salmonson, Dana)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Compel Arbitration re #10 Order on Stipulation, #1 Complaint, by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. Responses due by 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A- Declaration of Ellenburg, #3 Exhibit A1 - November 5, 2015 Notice, #4 Exhibit A2 - RPost Report, #5 Exhibit A3 - December 3, 2015 Reminder, #6 Exhibit A4 - December 14, 2015 Reminder, #7 Exhibit B - Declaration of Salmonson, #8 Exhibit B1 - May 31, 2019 Correspondence, #9 Exhibit B2 - June 10, 2019 Email, #10 Exhibit B3- June 17, 2019 Email) (Salmonson, Dana)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (Second Request). Sodexo, Inc. answer due 7/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #8 Order on Stipulation to Respond to #1 Complaint, by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Salmonson, Dana)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). Sodexo, Inc. answer due 6/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) Main Document 8 replaced and Modified on 6/4/2019 to reflect correct signatory judge (ADR).
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sodexo, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Sodexo, S.A., Other Affiliate SDH Services West, LLC, Other Affiliate Sodexo Management, Inc., Other Affiliate Sodexo America, LLC, Other Affiliate Sodexo Operations, LLC for Sodexo, Inc. added. (Salmonson, Dana)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Sodexo, Inc.. (Salmonson, Dana)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rodrigo Padilla re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,. Sodexo, Inc. served on 5/13/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (Foley, Jenny)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sodexo, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (MR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (MR)
May 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Rodrigo Padilla. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against Sodexo, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5543759) by Rodrigo Padilla. Proof of service due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to be issued)(Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. Sodexo, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sodexo, Inc.
Represented By: Dana B Salmonson
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodrigo Padilla
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Represented By: Marta D. Kurshumova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?