McAfee Ed.D v. Legacy Traditional School Nevada, Inc.

Plaintiff: Wade McAfee Ed.D
Defendant: Legacy Traditional School Nevada, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00811
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Legacy Traditional School Nevada, Inc. answer due 7/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Legacy Traditional School Nevada, Inc.. (Garcia, Jill)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wade McAfee Ed.D re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued. Legacy Traditional School Nevada, Inc. served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. (Foley, Jenny)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Legacy Traditional School Nevada, Inc. (JQC)
May 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (JQC)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wade McAfee Ed.D. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against Legacy Traditional School Nevada, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5543930) by Wade McAfee Ed.D. Proof of service due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to be issued)(Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAfee Ed.D v. Legacy Traditional School Nevada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wade McAfee Ed.D
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Represented By: Marta D. Kurshumova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Traditional School Nevada, Inc.
Represented By: Jill Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?