Maita et al v. McDonald et al
Plaintiff: Robert Maita and Michelle Maita
Defendant: Holbrook Asphalt LLC and Joseph McDonald
Case Number: 2:2019cv00823
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 10/28/2019. Motions due by 11/27/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, if needed, the parties shall file an appropriate motion requesting relief from this court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Michelle Maita, Robert Maita. (Ganier, Ashley)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Holbrook Asphalt LLC, Joseph McDonald. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kolkoski, Danielle)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michelle Maita, Robert Maita. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ganier, Ashley)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Holbrook Asphalt LLC, Joseph McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kolkoski, Danielle)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE - Regarding violation of the Local Rules and Attorney Action required as to document #5 - Wrong event was selected. Attorney Danielle A. Kolkoski is advised to refile document #5 using the correct Statement in Removal Case event in accordance with LR IC 2-2(c) and as directed in #2 Minute Order. Additionally, attorney Danielle A. Kolkoski is advised to properly link newly filed Statement to the corresponding #1 Petition for Removal, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Document #5 is terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1 (no image attached) (RFJ)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file her certificate of interested parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 6/12/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by Danielle A. Kolkoski. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document using the correct event in accordance with the local rules. RESPONSE to #2 Minute Order Removal Case, filed by Defendants Holbrook Asphalt LLC, Joseph McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Kolkoski, Danielle) Document #5 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1 on 5/29/2019 (RFJ).
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Danielle A. Kolkoski on behalf of Defendants Holbrook Asphalt LLC, Joseph McDonald. (Kolkoski, Danielle)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Mailing re #1 Petition for Removal,, Assign Judges in Civil Case, #2 Minute Order Removal Case, by Plaintiffs Michelle Maita, Robert Maita. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 DMV Notice of Service, #2 Exhibit Certified Info Sent to McDonald)(Ganier, Ashley)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/13/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/28/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-788692-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5545921) by Holbrook Asphalt LLC, Joseph McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bradford, Cheryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maita et al v. McDonald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holbrook Asphalt LLC
Represented By: Cheryl C. Bradford
Represented By: Danielle A. Kolkoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph McDonald
Represented By: Cheryl C. Bradford
Represented By: Danielle A. Kolkoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Maita
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ganier
Represented By: Joseph J. Wirth
Represented By: Bradley S. Mainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Maita
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ganier
Represented By: Joseph J. Wirth
Represented By: Bradley S. Mainor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?