Khalilian v. Monster Products, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Fred Khalilian
Defendant: Noel Lee, Bruce Giesbrecht, Monster Products, Inc and Kevin Lee
Case Number: 2:2019cv00831
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Docket Correction to #11 Proposed Summons to be issued : ERROR: Document appears to be a duplicate of #10 Proposed Summons and is therefore terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Kevin Lee, Noel Lee re #1 Complaint. (MR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 ERROR: Document is a duplicate of document #10 and is therefore terminated. PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Bruce Giesbrecht by Plaintiff Fred Khalilian. (Dowling, Elaine)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Kevinn Lee by Plaintiff Fred Khalilian. (Dowling, Elaine)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Noel Lee by Plaintiff Fred Khalilian. (Dowling, Elaine)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Monster Products, Inc. (JM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Monster Products, Inc by Plaintiff Fred Khalilian. (Dowling, Elaine)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #5 . The wrong event was selected and the document is blank. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and refile ECF No. #5 using the appropriate docket entry title "Proposed Summons to be Issued" event located under "Commencement of an Action, Etc." category. Document #5 is terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 ERROR: Document is blank and the attorney selected the wrong event. Attorney advised to refile correctly. Document #5 terminated. SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Fred Khalilian as to Monster Products, Inc. (Dowling, Elaine)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #3 . Document is not in compliance with LR IA 10-2 as the case number is deficient. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #3 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fred Khalilian that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Dowling, Elaine)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff shall file his certificate of interested parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 5/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5548510) by Fred Khalilian. Proof of service due by 8/12/2019.(Dowling, Elaine) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khalilian v. Monster Products, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Giesbrecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monster Products, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Khalilian
Represented By: Elaine A. Dowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?