Pure Parlay, LLC v. Stadium Technology Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pure Parlay, LLC
Defendant: Stadium Technology Group, Inc. and GVC Holdings, PLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00834
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2020 Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/21/2020. In light of the district judge's order granting the parties' stipulation to stay discovery and case deadlines, IT IS ORDERED that the August 5 pre-claim construction settlement conference is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 30 days following the district judge's order resolving the motion to dismiss (ECF No. #47 ), the parties must file a joint status report proposing dates for the pre-claim construction settlement conference required by LPR 1-19(a). (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting #61 Stipulation to Stay Discovery and Case Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 9, 2020 Filing 61 First STIPULATION to Stay Discovery and Case Deadlines re #45 Order, by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Phillips, Rob)
July 7, 2020 Filing 60 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/7/2020. IT IS ORDERED that ECF No. 59 is DENIED. If the parties wish to stay discovery pending the outcome of the motion to dismiss, they should file such a stipulation. If the parties do not wish to stay discovery, they should file another stipulation to extend discovery and explain why such an extension is needed, independent of needing to wait for the motion to dismiss to be decided. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh)
July 6, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #57 Stipulation by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Phillips, Rob)
July 6, 2020 Filing 58 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #57 . Document is missing Judge's signature block. Pursuant to LR IA 6-2: A stipulation or ex parte or unopposed motion must include an "order" in the form of a signature block on which the court or clerk can endorse approval of the relief sought. This signature block must not begin on a separate page. Attorney Rob L. Phillips is advised to file the corrected document using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #57 . (no image attached) (SLD)
July 6, 2020 Filing 57 VIEW Corrected Image #59 re: STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re Discovery re #45 Order, by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Phillips, Rob) Modified on 7/6/2020 (SLD).
May 21, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE of Change of Address by Michael N Feder. (Feder, Michael)
May 11, 2020 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to #47 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc. (Feder, Michael)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting without prejudice #53 First STIPULATION for Withdrawal of #48 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 7, 2020 Filing 53 First STIPULATION for Withdrawal re #48 Motion for Judgment, by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc. (Feder, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE to #48 Motion for Judgment, by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. Replies due by 5/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Phillips, Rob)
May 4, 2020 Filing 51 RESPONSE to #47 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. Replies due by 5/11/2020. (Phillips, Rob)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #49 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Re: #47 Motion to Dismiss, #48 Motion for Judgment. Responses are due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 1, 2020 Filing 49 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #48 Motion for Judgment, #47 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Phillips, Rob)
April 17, 2020 Filing 48 Allowed Withdrawn by #54 Order MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc.. Responses due by 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Feder, Michael) Modified on 5/11/2020 (DRS).
April 17, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc.. Responses due by 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4) (Feder, Michael)
April 14, 2020 Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 4/14/2020. A Pre-Claim Construction Settlement Conference (the "SC") was originally scheduled to take place on March 24, 2020. (ECF No. 28.) Subsequently, the parties stipulated, and the Court ordered, that the disclosures required by LPR 1-6 through LPR 1-12 be continued, with the latest disclosures occurring on July 20, 2020. (ECF No. 45.) Additionally, the parties proposed, and the Court ordered, that the SC take place on April 21, 2020. (Id.) However, pursuant to the Local Rules, the SC "must be held within 30 days after the parties have submitted all initial disclosures and responses thereto as required under LPR 1-6 through LPR 1-12." LPR 1-19 (emphasis added). Therefore, the SC scheduled for April 21, 2020 is RESCHEDULED to August 5, 2020, at 9:00 AM. Pre-SC briefs are due on July 29, 2020, and must be submitted to david_chavez@nvd.uscourts.gov. A pre-SC Telephonic Status Check is scheduled for August 4, 2020, at 3:00 PM. Parties are directed to dial 877-810-9415 five minutes before the hearing and enter access code "2365998" when prompted. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery as to #28 Order. The Pre-Claim Construction Settlement Conference is rescheduled to 4/21/2020. The pre-settlement conference call is rescheduled to 4/20/2020 at 3:00 p.m. Settlement conference statements must be emailed to chambers per ECF No. 40 by 4:00 p.m. on 4/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 23, 2020 Filing 44 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #43 . Document not filed pursuant to LR IA 6-2. A stipulation or ex parte or unopposed motion must include an "order" in the form of a signature block on which the court or clerk can endorse approval of the relief sought.Attorney Rob L. Phillips is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #43 . (no image attached) (SLD)
March 22, 2020 Filing 43 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery re #28 Order, by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Phillips, Rob)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting #41 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #37 Second Amended Complaint GVC Holdings, PLC answer due 4/17/2020; Stadium Technology Group, Inc. answer due 4/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 17, 2020 Filing 41 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to File Response to #37 Second Amended Complaint by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc. (Rothstein, Evan)
March 17, 2020 Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/17/2020. The Court modifies its Order setting Pre-Claim Construction Settlement Conference (SC) (ECF No. 30) in two respects. First, instead of submitting their confidential SC statements by physical delivery to Judge Weksler's chambers, the parties must electronically submit the SC statements to david_chavez@nvd.uscourts.gov. No physical copies will be accepted. Second, the SC will take place telephonically. In the email message containing counsel's electronic submission, counsel must also submit telephonic contact information where Judge Weksler can reach out directly to counsel and the parties throughout the duration of the SC. Judge Weksler will call plaintiff to initiate the SC; she will call defendant once she completes her initial caucus with plaintiff. The Court orders that counsel make arrangements to ensure that the parties can meaningfully participate in the SC discussions and to reach out to the Court if they require assistance. The remainder of the Court's order, including any applicable deadlines and the pre-SC telephonic status check, remains in place. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DCh)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Response to #37 Second Amended Complaint. GVC Holdings, PLC answer due 3/30/2020; Stadium Technology Group, Inc. answer due 3/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 27, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Response to #37 Second Amended Complaint by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc. (Rothstein, Evan)
February 24, 2020 Filing 37 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Pure Parlay, LLC. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Phillips, Rob)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Anne Pearlman withdrawn as counsel for Defendants Stadium Technology Group, Inc. and GVC Holdings, PLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/10/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 7, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Anne W. Pearlman for Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc. (Feder, Michael)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss. The #5 Amended Complaint is also Dismissed without Prejudice. Plaintiff has 21 days from the entry of this order to file a second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined in this Order, with respect to any documents filed under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting #31 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 7, 2020 Filing 31 Proposed STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Phillips, Rob)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER setting Pre-Claim Construction Settlement Conference for 3/31/2020 at 09:00 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Additionally, a Pre-Settlement Telephone Conference is set for 3/30/2020 at 8:00 a.m.The settlement conference statements must be received in chambers by 4:00 p.m. on 3/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 18, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #27 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The Court will enter a separate Order scheduling the Pre-Claim Construction Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 7, 2019 Filing 27 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; filed by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Phillips, Rob)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that within 21 days from the date of this order, the parties must meet and confer and file a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 4, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #12 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Phillips, Rob) Text modified by Clerk's Office on 8/22/2019.
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #5 Amended Complaint and #9 Summons Issued as to GVC Holdings PLC #12 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Phillips, Rob) Modified on 8/22/2019 to reflect correct docket entry relationship (MMM).
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #12 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 15, 2019 Filing 21 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #12 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. Replies due by 8/22/2019. (Phillips, Rob)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Evan M. Rothstein and approving Attorney Michael N. Feder as Designation of Local Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/15/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Patrick Hall and approving Attorney Michael N. Feder as Designation of Local Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/15/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anne Pearlman and approving Attorney Michael N. Feder as Designation of Local Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/15/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Anne Pearlman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5660455) by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Patrick Hall and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5647133) by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Evan Rothstein and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael N. Feder (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5647126) by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc.. (Feder, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Stadium Technology Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Ladbrokes Holdco, Inc, Other Affiliate Ladbrokes Subco, LLC, Other Affiliate Ladbrokes Holdco Irrevocable Trust,, Other Affiliate Ladbrokes Coral Group Ltd., Other Affiliate GVC Holdings (UK) Limited for GVC Holdings, PLC added. (Feder, Michael)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint by Defendants GVC Holdings, PLC, Stadium Technology Group, Inc.. Responses due by 8/15/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Anne W. Pearlman) (Feder, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pure Parlay, LLC re #5 Amended Complaint. GVC Holdings, PLC served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Phillips, Rob)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pure Parlay, LLC re #5 Amended Complaint. Stadium Technology Group, Inc. served on 7/11/2019, answer due 8/1/2019. (Phillips, Rob)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to GVC Holdings, PLC and Stadium Technology Group, Inc. re #5 Amended Complaint. (SLD)
July 5, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued against GVC Holdings, PLC by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Phillips, Rob)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued against Stadium Technology Group, Inc. by Plaintiff Pure Parlay, LLC. (Phillips, Rob)
July 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pure Parlay, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Phillips, Rob)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Pure Parlay, LLC. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 9/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Asserted Patent)(Phillips, Rob)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pure Parlay, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Phillips, Rob)
May 17, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (SLD) (Main Document 3 replaced on 5/15/2019) (SLD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/15/2019: #1 Complaint) (SLD).
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Stadium Technology Group, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
May 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (SLD)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Stadium Technology Group, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5549233) by Pure Parlay, LLC. Proof of service due by 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Phillips, Rob) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pure Parlay, LLC v. Stadium Technology Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pure Parlay, LLC
Represented By: Rob L. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stadium Technology Group, Inc.
Represented By: Anne Pearlman
Represented By: Evan M. Rothstein
Represented By: Patrick Hall
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GVC Holdings, PLC
Represented By: Anne Pearlman
Represented By: Evan M. Rothstein
Represented By: Patrick Hall
Represented By: Michael N Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?