Moran v. United Services Automobile Association et al
Plaintiff: Fern Moran
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company, United Services Automobile Association and USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00835
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation to Amend Caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Amend Caption by Plaintiff Fern Moran. (Hilton, Cory)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fern Moran. (Hilton, Cory)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fern Moran. USAA General Indemnity Company served on 6/7/2019, answer due 6/28/2019. (Hilton, Cory)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Fern Moran. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hilton, Cory)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Fern Moran. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hilton, Cory)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to USAA General Indemnity Company re #1 Complaint. (MR)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Fern Moran. (Hilton, Cory)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE and Attorney Action Required as to Proposed Summons re: #1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Summons not issued due to attorney's information not listed pursuant to FRCP 4C.CORRECTION: Pursuant to FRCP 4C summons are to "state the name and address of the Plaintiff's attorney." Attorney Cory J. Hilton advised to download and complete updated "AO 440 (Rev. 6/12) Summons in a Civil Action" form from Court's Website www.nvd.uscourts.gov in accordance with FRCP 4C and refile as a separate event using "Proposed Summons" event and link to #1 COMPLAINT pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and LR IC 2-2(d). (no image attached) (MMM)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Robert L. English is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
May 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 view #6 corrected image re civil cover sheet COMPLAINT against USAA General Indemnity Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5549579) by Fern Moran. Proof of service due by 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hilton, Cory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moran v. United Services Automobile Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Services Automobile Association
Represented By: Priscilla Louise O'Briant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Priscilla Louise O'Briant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fern Moran
Represented By: Cory J. Hilton
Represented By: Robert L English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?