Nelson L. Cohen v. James River Insurance Company, et al.
Plaintiff: Nelson L Cohen
Defendant: James River Insurance Company and Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00838
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/17/2019. Motions due by 1/19/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant James River Insurance Company (Acker, Paul)
June 5, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Acker, Paul)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nelson L Cohen. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Greene, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 5/20/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/4/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT 1 and 2 to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer)(Acker, Paul)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 Petition for Removal. ERROR: State Court documents are missing. Counsel is advised to file State Court documents as an Exhibit and link to #1 . This case will be administratively closed if documents are not filed by the close of business Tuesday, May 21, 2019. (no image attached) (EDS)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 Petition for Removal. ERROR: State Court documents are missing. Counsel is advised to submit state court documents as an exhibit and link ECF No. #1 . (no image attached) (EDS)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant James River Insurance Company. (Acker, Paul)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-792344-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5550458) by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Acker, Paul) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson L. Cohen v. James River Insurance Company, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nelson L Cohen
Represented By: Robert D. Vannah
Represented By: John B. Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul A. Acker
Represented By: Roger W. Strassburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aon Risk Insurance Services West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?