Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated
Plaintiff: Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Case Number: 2:2019cv00852
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: George Foley
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1338
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
July 15, 2019 Filing 27 EX PARTE DOCUMENT Supplemental Briefing to #20 Ex Parte Motion, 25 Minute Order Setting Hearing on Ex Parte, by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 26, #2 Exhibit 27, #3 Exhibit 28, #4 Exhibit 29) (Bayramoglu, Nihat) Modified docket text on 7/16/2019 (DKJ).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED #18 , #21 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal are granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Schedule "A" seal will be automatically lifted upon the filing of a Proof of Service, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu re #20 Ex Parte Motion, by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23) (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Table of Contents of Exhibits, #3 Peng Declaration) (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 9/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Schedule A, #2 Exhibit C)(Bayramoglu, Nihat)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/21/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #13 Motion for Leave to File Document, by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #13 . Document is not in compliance with LR IA 10-2 as the case number is deficient. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #13 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 VIEW #15 corrected image re MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Clean First Amended Complaint, #2 Redlined First Amended Complaint, #3 REDACTED Amended Schedule A, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order) (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 EX PARTE MOTION FOR ENTRY OF A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Yibing Peng, #6 Proposed Order) (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 EX PARTE MOTION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-00852-GMN-GWF. (no image attached) (DKJ)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/28/2019. The Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/22/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate DESHENG investment Co. Ltd. for Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd. added. (Bayramoglu, Nihat)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5554270) by Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.. Proof of service due by 8/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 AO120 Patent and Trademark Report, #5 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Bayramoglu, Nihat) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic v. The Partnerships and Unincorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winner's Sun Plastic & Electronic (Shenzhen) Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Nihat Deniz Bayramoglu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?