Anaya v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Amida Anaya
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00867
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #10 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/17/2020. Motions due by 3/18/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice of Plaintiff's Claim for Loss of Past and Future Wages and Earning Capacity by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael) Modified to unterminate on 6/26/2019 (JM).
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation (Federico, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amida Anaya. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Moss, Boyd)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Rule 26-1(a)(1) Conference by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Federico, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/22/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/6/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/6/2019.(Federico, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Costco Wholesale Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Federico, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-794174-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5559074) by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing Petition, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Federico, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anaya v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amida Anaya
Represented By: Marcus A. Berg
Represented By: Boyd B Moss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Michael A. Federico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?