Wrenn v. AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.

Plaintiff: Michael Wrenn
Defendant: AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00868
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/24/2020. Motions due by 3/25/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Michael Wrenn Special Scheduling Review Requested (Powell, Paul)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Michael Wrenn. (Powell, Paul)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Thome, Sheri)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/13/2019.(Thome, Sheri) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Wrenn. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Powell, Paul)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Wrenn. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Powell, Paul)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. added. (Thome, Sheri)
May 23, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/22/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/6/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 22, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-729616-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5559185) by AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Proof of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Thome, Sheri) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wrenn v. AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Wrenn
Represented By: Paul D Powell
Represented By: Michael A. Kristof
Represented By: Jason F Lather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: Sheri M. Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?