Martin v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Robert Martin
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00879
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #13 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant Walmart Inc.. Replies due by 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - April 11 Correspondence) (Arata, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Robert Martin. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Romand, Genevieve)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Robert Martin. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Romand, Genevieve)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT regarding Removal by Defendant Walmart Inc. (Arata, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/17/2019. Plaintiff was ordered to file a certificate of interested parties by June 7, 2019, Docket No. 3, but has not done so. The Court again orders Plaintiff to file a certificate of interested parties, this time by June 20, 2019. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THIS ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE IMPOSITION OF SANCTIONS. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Court issues this order to advise the parties that discovery motions filed in this case will not be briefed according to the default schedule outlined in Local Rule 7-2(b), but will instead be briefed on shortened deadlines absent leave from the Court, see Local Rule IA 1-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #6 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/20/2019. Motions due by 12/20/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Defendant Walmart Inc. (Arata, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Arata, Michael)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Arata, Michael)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/28/2019. Defendant filed an answer prior to removal. Docket No. 1-3. The parties shall file a proposed discovery plan by June 7, 2019. The proposed discovery plan must identify the discovery already conducted in state court, if any. In addition, the parties shall both file certificates of interested parties by June 7, 2019. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1); Local Rule 7.1-1(c). IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
May 28, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/24/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/8/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 24, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-19-788596-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5563032) by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Arata, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Represented By: Michael A Arata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Martin
Represented By: Genevieve Romand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?