Difranco v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Cathy L. Difranco
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv00896
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Tina L. Naicker on behalf of Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Naicker, Tina)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #4 Complaint and #5 Summons Issued as to the Commissioner of Social Security. (no service date listed - SLD)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #5 Summons Issued as to USA. US Attorney for the District of Nevada served on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/10/2019. (JM) Modified on 6/12/2019 to reflect party served (MMM).
June 10, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS 7018 2290 0001 8797 0540 and 7018 2290 0001 8797 0557 re #4 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued as to USA. (ADR)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (JM)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Cathy L. Difranco. Proof of service due by 9/4/2019.(JM)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of court shall file the complaint and issue summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/6/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 28, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (DKJ)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David F. Chermol and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Hal Taylor (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5564521) by Plaintiff Cathy L. Difranco. (Attachments: #1 Cert. Good Standing) (Taylor, Hal)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Cathy L. Difranco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Summons USAG, #4 Summons USAG, #5 Summons OGC) (Taylor, Hal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Difranco v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina L. Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy L. Difranco
Represented By: Hal Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?