Samadani et al v. Heider et al
Plaintiff: Edward Samadani and Vargha Samadani
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC dba Alamo, William Heider and Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00904
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the Court issues this order to advise the parties that discovery motions filed in this case will not be briefed according to the default schedule outlined in Local Rule 7-2(b), but will instead be briefed on shortened deadlines absent leave from the Court, see Local Rule IA 1-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (SLD)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #12 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/25/2019. Motions due by 12/26/2019. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 JOINT PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order; filed by Plaintiff Edward Samadani. (Lovell, Dan)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that the parties are to file no later than 7/19/2019 a joint proposed discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 JOINT STATUS REPORT; filed by Defendant William Heider. (Goldman, Brian)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Re: #8 Response. The #5 Order to Show Cause is deemed satisfied and the case will not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction at this time. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 Order to Show Cause, by Defendant William Heider. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dept.ofStateDivisionofCorpsREBusinessFilingsinDelaware, #2 Exhibit SecofStateStatementofInfoREEnterpriseLeasingCo.-West,LLC, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff'sPre-LitigationDemand) (Goldman, Brian)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant William Heider. (Goldman, Brian)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by William Heider. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Goldman, Brian)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Defendant William Heider shall show cause, in writing, as to why this action should not be remanded to the state court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to show cause by 6/21/2019 will result in remand to the state court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for Defendant shall have until 6/3/2019 to comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 29, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/29/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/13/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 28, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by William Heider. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/12/2019.(Goldman, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number A-19-787730-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5565439) by William Heider. Proof of service due by 4/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldman, Brian) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samadani et al v. Heider et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC dba Alamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Heider
Represented By: Brian W Goldman
Represented By: James P Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Leasing Company-West, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Samadani
Represented By: Dan J. Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vargha Samadani
Represented By: Dan J. Lovell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?