Lopez et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Dallas Lopez, Alexandra Camille Lopez and D. L.
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2019cv00911
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #10 Amended Complaint. Summons Returned Executed (error using correct code) Acknowledgement by Plaintiff Alexandra Camille Lopez. (Carter, Brett)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 THIRD CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Attorney's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #10 . Attorney Lindsay K Eaton/Cullen is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (DKJ) Modified on 6/24/2019 to reflect this is the third notice (DKJ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Alexandra Camille Lopez. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Carter, Brett)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against United States of America by Alexandra Camille Lopez. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 9/19/2019.(Carter, Brett)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to United States of America re 1 Complaint. (JQC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Alexandra Camille Lopez. (Carter, Brett)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 EX PARTE MOTION to Seal re: 1 COMPLAINT and 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties; filed by Plaintiffs D. L., Alexandra Camille Lopez. (Carter, Brett)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND CLERK'S NOTICE regarding Non-Compliance with LR IC 6-1(2). Document 4 is not in compliance with Local Rule IC 6-1(2). The clerk has restricted access to document 4 and advises counsel a second time to review and file documents in compliance with this Court's Local Rules. (no image attached) (DKJ)
May 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Attorney's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. 1 . Attorney Lindsay K Eaton (Lindsay K Cullen) is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (DKJ)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding 1 Complaint. Case and document were not filed pursuant to LR IC 6-1(2). The clerk has restricted access to document 1 Complaint and changed the name of the minor child to reflect initials only. Counsel is advised to review LR IC 6-1 and file documents pursuant to this court's local rules. (no image attached) (DKJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Lopez
Represented By: Brett A Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Camille Lopez
Represented By: Brett A Carter
Represented By: Lindsay K Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. L.
Represented By: Brett A Carter
Represented By: Lindsay K Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?