Hooley v. Wal-Mart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ivan Hooley
Defendant: Walmart Inc. and Wal-Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00913
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER Re: #19 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/10/2020. Motions due by 5/11/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/10/2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in future requests from this court, counsel shall comply with LR 26-1(a) stating "SPECIAL SCHEDULING REVIEW REQUESTED" on the face of the document when requesting longer or different time periods for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 18, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ivan Hooley (Parker, Blair)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #16 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William K. Koska and approving Attorney Scott Symmons as Designation of Local Counsel for Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #14 Stipulation to Strike (Second Request). Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 Second MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William K. Koska and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Scott C. Symmons (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5606720) by Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Mazeika, Tomas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #11 Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice,,,,, by Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Mazeika, Tomas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 14 SECOND STIPULATION to Strike; filed by Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Mazeika, Tomas)
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/25/2019. Before the Court is the #10 Stipulation to Strike. Stipulations must be both signed and dated by the parties. Here, the Stipulation contains counsels' respective signatures, but the signatures are not dated. In addition, the Stipulation fails to comply with the form of order set forth in LR IA 6-2. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #10 Stipulation to Strike is DENIED without prejudice. The parties are directed to refile a properly executed stipulation. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEB)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Ivan Hooley. (Parker, Blair)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #9 the Verified Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice is DENIED without prejudice. Counsel is directed correct the deficiencies and submit a new application by 7/8/19. Counsel will be required to repay the filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel must SHOW CAUSE as to why the sworn notarized Acknowledgment appears to contain false information. Show cause response due 7/8/19. to Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Strike; filed by Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Mazeika, Tomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William K. Koska and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Tomas V. Mazeika (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5588241) by Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Mazeika, Tomas)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Mazeika, Tomas)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Substitute Attorney Tomas V. Mazeika for Wal-Mart, Inc. substituted for Attorneys Timothy David Kuhls and Robert K. Phillips. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/10/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 JOINT MOTION to Substitute Attorney Tomas v. Mazeika in for Attorney Timothy D. Kuhls by Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Kuhls, Timothy)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE of Violation re: LR IC 7-1(c) and Attorney Action Required as to document #4 - ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR IC 7-1(c) and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Timothy David Kuhls. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document #4 , using the correct Joint Motion to Substitute Attorney event, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) and LR 7-1(c). Document #4 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1. (no image attached) (RFJ)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 ERROR: Document not filed pursuant to LR 7-1(c) by attorney Timothy David Kuhls. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document using the correct event Joint Motion to Substitute Attorney in accordance with the local rules. STIPULATION; filed by Defendant Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Kuhls, Timothy) Document #4 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1 on 6/10/2019 (RFJ).
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wal-Mart, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kuhls, Timothy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/30/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/14/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 29, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-789615-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5567555) by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Kuhls, Timothy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hooley v. Wal-Mart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Timothy David Kuhls
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy David Kuhls
Represented By: William K. Koska
Represented By: Tomas V. Mazeika
Represented By: Scott C. Symmons
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Hooley
Represented By: James L Edwards
Represented By: Blair Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?