Thomas v. US Oncology Corporate, Inc
Plaintiff: Vanessa Thomas
Defendant: US Oncology Corporate, Inc
Case Number: 2:2019cv00958
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION to Substitute Party; filed by Defendant US Oncology Corporate, Inc. (Branson, Z.)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by US Oncology Corporate, Inc that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent McKesson Corporation, Other Affiliate RMCC Cancer Center, LLC for US Oncology Corporate, Inc added. (Krincek, Wendy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by US Oncology Corporate, Inc. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/12/2019.(Branson, Z.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 ERRATA to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Vanessa Thomas. (Forster, Eran)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Stipulation; US Oncology Corporate, Inc answer due 7/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Responsive Pleading re #1 Complaint, by Defendant US Oncology Corporate, Inc. (Branson, Z.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vanessa Thomas re #3 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Watkins, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to US Oncology Corporate, Inc re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
June 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (ADR)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Vanessa Thomas. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Watkins, Daniel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5576471) by Vanessa Thomas. Proof of service due by 9/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons US ONCOLOGY CORPORATE, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Watkins, Daniel) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. US Oncology Corporate, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Thomas
Represented By: Eran Scott Forster
Represented By: Daniel R Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Oncology Corporate, Inc
Represented By: Wendy M. Krincek
Represented By: Z. Kathryn Branson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?