Rivera v. Dzurenda et al
Plaintiff: Ariel Rivera
Defendant: Rene Baker, Steve Sisolak, Jerry Howell, James Dzurenda and A.G. Aaron Ford
Case Number: 2:2019cv00961
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Ariel Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Service Forms)(JQC)
August 1, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Waiver of liability, filed by Plaintiff Ariel Rivera. Responses due by 8/15/2019.(JQC) (Main Document 8 replaced on 8/2/2019) (JQC).
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Plaintiff Ariel Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(JQC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/24/2019. LEGAL ADVICE: Neither the court nor the clerk's office can give legal advice re #4 Letter. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER from Ariel Rivera. (JQC)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Ariel Rivera. (JQC)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, or (2) pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 6/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Ariel Rivera. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Supplement, #3 Exhibit)(JQC)
June 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera v. Dzurenda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rene Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sisolak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.G. Aaron Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?