Wahrer et al v. Clark County School District et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Wahrer, Britten Wahrer and J. J.
Defendant: Pat Skorkowsky, Melody Carter and Clark County School District
Case Number: 2:2019cv00965
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Clark County School District, Pat Skorkowsky. (Hendricks, Kara)
July 3, 2019 Filing 15 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs J. J., Britten Wahrer, Joshua Wahrer. (Hubley, Gregg)
June 27, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs J. J., Britten Wahrer, Joshua Wahrer. Replies due by 7/4/2019.(Hubley, Gregg)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 JOINDER to #11 Statement in Removal Case by Defendant Melody Carter. (Kurth, Robert) Modified on 6/24/2019 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1(a)(2) (MMM).
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Melody Carter that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Kurth, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Clark County School District, Pat Skorkowsky. (Hendricks, Kara)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Order Regarding Statement Regarding Removal by Clark County School District, Pat Skorkowsky re #4 Minute Order Removal Case,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Order) (Hendricks, Kara)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eugene Feldman for J. J., Joshua Wahrer, Britten Wahrer and approving Designation of Local Counsel Gregg A Hubley. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/18/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by J. J., Britten Wahrer, Joshua Wahrer. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hubley, Gregg)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Eugene Feldman, Esq. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Gregg A. Hubley, Esq. (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5589765) by Plaintiffs J. J., Britten Wahrer, Joshua Wahrer. (Hubley, Gregg)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Clark County School District, Pat Skorkowsky. Responses due by 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 , #2 Exhibit 2 ) (Hendricks, Kara) Modified on 6/14/2019 to restrict access to Exhibit 1 pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (MMM).
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 JOINDER to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Melody Carter. (Kurth, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/6/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/21/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Eugene Feldman to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/21/2019. (no image attached) (MR)
June 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (MR)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County School District, Pat Skorkowsky. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Hendricks, Kara)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-794103-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5577581) by Clark County School District, Pat Skorkowsky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint (redacted), #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hendricks, Kara) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wahrer et al v. Clark County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Wahrer
Represented By: Marianne C. Lanuti
Represented By: Gregg A Hubley
Represented By: Eugene Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britten Wahrer
Represented By: Marianne C. Lanuti
Represented By: Gregg A Hubley
Represented By: Eugene Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. J.
Represented By: Marianne C. Lanuti
Represented By: Gregg A Hubley
Represented By: Eugene Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Skorkowsky
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Whitney Welch-Kirmse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melody Carter
Represented By: Robert O. Kurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Whitney Welch-Kirmse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?