Borenstein v. Lead Animal Shelter Animal Foundation et al
Plaintiff: Brian Borenstein
Defendant: Lead Animal Shelter Animal Foundation, Clark County Animal Control and Lead Animal Shelter Management Animal Control
Case Number: 2:2019cv00985
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
2 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-00985-APG-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 EXHIBIT to #3 Motion for TRO by Plaintiff Brian Borenstein. (JM) Modified on 7/5/2019 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (MMM).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Referring to Pro Bono Program. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Pro Bono Liaison - JM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Brian Borenstein. (MR)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brian Borenstein. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (MR)
June 10, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borenstein v. Lead Animal Shelter Animal Foundation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Borenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lead Animal Shelter Animal Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Animal Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lead Animal Shelter Management Animal Control
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?