Kille Sr v. Nevada Department of Public Safety, et al
Plaintiff: David August Kille Sr
Defendant: Barbara Cegavske, Adam Laxalt, Brian Williams, Nevada Department of Public Safety, Nevada Board of Prison Commissioners, Ed Gray, Steve Sisolak, Tom Lawson, Brian Sandoval, Nevada Parole Board, Eric Christiansen, Nevada Department of Corrections, Bailey, Michael Keeler, Stephanie O'Rourke, Natulre Wood, Tony Corda, State of Nevada, Adam Endel, Aaron D. Ford, James Dzurenda, Susan Jackson and James Wright
Case Number: 2:2019cv00988
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Extend Copy Work, filed by Plaintiff David August Kille Sr. (ADR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to #5 , #6 Motions to Remand to State Court, filed by Plaintiff David August Kille Sr. (ADR)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #7 Motion for Sanctions by Defendants Bailey, Barbara Cegavske, Eric Christiansen, Tony Corda, James Dzurenda, Adam Endel, Aaron D. Ford, Ed Gray, Susan Jackson, Michael Keeler, Tom Lawson, Adam Laxalt, Nevada Board of Prison Commissioners, Nevada Department of Corrections, Nevada Department of Public Safety, Nevada Parole Board, Stephanie O'Rourke, Brian Sandoval, Steve Sisolak, State of Nevada, Brian Williams, Natulre Wood. Replies due by 7/30/2019. (Brady, Katlyn)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Bailey, Barbara Cegavske, Eric Christiansen, Tony Corda, James Dzurenda, Adam Endel, Aaron D. Ford, Ed Gray, Susan Jackson, Michael Keeler, Tom Lawson, Adam Laxalt, Nevada Board of Prison Commissioners, Nevada Department of Corrections, Nevada Department of Public Safety, Nevada Parole Board, Stephanie O'Rourke, Brian Sandoval, Steve Sisolak, State of Nevada, Brian Williams, Natulre Wood. Replies due by 7/30/2019. (Brady, Katlyn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #5 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Bailey, Barbara Cegavske, Eric Christiansen, Tony Corda, James Dzurenda, Adam Endel, Aaron D. Ford, Ed Gray, Susan Jackson, Michael Keeler, Tom Lawson, Adam Laxalt, Nevada Board of Prison Commissioners, Nevada Department of Corrections, Nevada Department of Public Safety, Nevada Parole Board, Stephanie O'Rourke, Brian Sandoval, Steve Sisolak, State of Nevada, Brian Williams, Natulre Wood. Replies due by 7/18/2019. (Brady, Katlyn)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Defendants Bailey, Barbara Cegavske, Eric Christiansen, Tony Corda, James Dzurenda, Adam Endel, Aaron D. Ford, Ed Gray, Susan Jackson, Michael Keeler, Tom Lawson, Adam Laxalt, Nevada Board of Prison Commissioners, Nevada Department of Corrections, Nevada Department of Public Safety, Nevada Parole Board, Stephanie O'Rourke, Brian Sandoval, Steve Sisolak, State of Nevada, Brian Williams, Natulre Wood. (Brady, Katlyn)
July 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff David August Kille Sr. Responses due by 7/24/2019. (JM)
July 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff David August Kille Sr. Responses due by 7/24/2019. (JM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Plaintiff David August Kille Sr. Responses due by 7/12/2019. (ADR)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Barbara Cegavske, Eric Christiansen, Tony Corda, James Dzurenda, Adam Endel, Aaron D. Ford, Ed Gray, Susan Jackson, Michael Keeler, Adam Laxalt, Nevada Board of Prison Commissioners, Nevada Department of Corrections, Brian Sandoval, Steve Sisolak, State of Nevada, Brian Williams. (Brady, Katlyn)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/11/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/26/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-793417-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5582386) by Nevada Board of Prison Commissioners, Eric Christiansen, The State of Nevada, Ed Gray, Steve Sisolak, Barbara Cegavske, Adam Endel, Michael Keeler, Brian Williams, Brian Sandoval, Aaron D. Ford, Adam Laxalt, Nevada Department of Corrections, Tony Corda, James Dzurenda, Susan Jackson. Proof of service due by 7/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Brady, Katlyn) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kille Sr v. Nevada Department of Public Safety, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Cegavske
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Laxalt
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Public Safety
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Board of Prison Commissioners
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Gray
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Sisolak
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Lawson
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Parole Board
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Christiansen
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bailey
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Keeler
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie O'Rourke
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natulre Wood
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Corda
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Endel
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron D. Ford
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Jackson
Represented By: Katlyn Brady
Represented By: Steven Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David August Kille Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?