Patrick et al v. Can Can Room LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick, Carmen Electra and Lucy Pinder
Defendant: JUA LLC, Can Can Room LLC, Video City, CCR Partners LLC and Sam Aldabbagh
Case Number: 2:2019cv00990
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER re #15 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/30/2019. Motions due by 1/29/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order; filed by Plaintiffs Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder. (Sexton, David)
July 19, 2019 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendant Sam Aldabbagh. (Galliher, Keith)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder. Replies due by 7/23/2019. (Sexton, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder re #3 Summons Issued. JUA LLC served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Of Service, #2 Affidavit Affidavit Of Attempted Service)(Sexton, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder re #3 Summons Issued. Sam Aldabbagh served on 7/2/2019, answer due 7/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Of Service, #2 Affidavit Affidavit Of Attempted Service)(Sexton, David)
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder re #3 Summons Issued. Can Can Room LLC served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Of Service, #2 Affidavit Affidavit Of Attempted Service, #3 Affidavit Affidavit Of Attempted Service)(Sexton, David)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sam Aldabbagh. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Galliher, Keith)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Sam Aldabbagh. Responses due by 7/16/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/16/2019. (Galliher, Keith) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder re #3 Summons Issued. Video City served on 6/29/2019, answer due 7/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Of Service)(Sexton, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder re #3 Summons Issued. CCR Partners LLC served on 6/14/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit Of Service)(Sexton, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #4 . Incorrect event selected by attorney. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #4 using the appropriate docket entry title "Summons Returned Executed" and also attorney is advised to file documents pursuant to LR IA 10-2 as the correct case number for this case is 2:19-cv-00990-RFB-NJK. Attorney advised to correct the case number. Document #4 terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 ERROR: Incorrect event selected and deficient case number. Attorney advised to correct the deficiency and refile correctly. AFFIDAVIT of Service re #3 Summons Issued by Plaintiffs Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons CCR Partners LLC)(Sexton, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
June 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (MR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sexton, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5582580) by Tara Leigh Patrick, Lucy Pinder. Proof of service due by 9/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Can Can Room LLC dba Can Can Room Summons, #5 Summons Sam Aldabbagh Summons, #6 Summons Video City Summons, #7 Summons JUA LLC Summons, #8 Summons CCR Partners LLC Summons)(Bonds, Kurt) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick et al v. Can Can Room LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Leigh Patrick
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Electra
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucy Pinder
Represented By: Kurt R. Bonds
Represented By: David Michael Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Can Can Room LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Video City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CCR Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Aldabbagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?