Clarke v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Diane Clarke
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, Lee Cissna, Jeanne M. Kent and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 2:2019cv00993
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-00993-JAD-EJY. (no image attached) (ADR)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mary Larakers on behalf of Defendants Lee Cissna, Jeanne M. Kent, Kevin McAleenan. (Larakers, Mary)
July 23, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Mailing #4 Summons Issued as to USA; filed by Plaintiff Diane Clarke. (Bennion, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Mailing for #4 Summons Issued as to USA by Plaintiff Diane Clarke. (Bennion, Charles)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Mailing for #4 Summons Issued as to USA; filed by Plaintiff Diane Clarke. (Bennion, Charles)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Diane Clarke. (Bennion, Charles)
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Attorney Action Required as to #6 Proposed Summons - ERROR: Proposed Summons not issued as Named Defendant(s) were not properly listed on Proposed Summons. CORRECTION: Pursuant to FRCP 4 summons are issued for each named defendants to be served. Attorney Charles W. Bennion advised the Court will only issue summons for those parties properly listed within the Complaint pursuant to FRCP 4. Document #6 terminated as filed in error. (no image attached) (RFJ)
July 17, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Diane Clarke. (Bennion, Charles)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing for #4 Summons Issued as to USA, #2 Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Diane Clarke. (Attachments: #1 Certificate, #2 Certificate)(Bennion, Charles)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants. (ADR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Diane Clarke. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons)(Bennion, Charles)
June 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Lee Cissna, Jeanne M. Kent, Kevin McAleenan (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5583483) by Diane Clarke. Proof of service due by 9/9/2019.(Bennion, Charles) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Diane Clarke that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. (Bennion, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clarke v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Clarke
Represented By: Charles W. Bennion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Cissna
Represented By: Mary Larakers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne M. Kent
Represented By: Mary Larakers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Mary Larakers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?