Boskovich v. Great Basin Water Co.
Plaintiff: Ronald Boskovich
Defendant: Great Basin Water Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01001
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the ENE conference currently scheduled for 9/12/2019 is VACATED and CONTINUED to 9/16/2019. Plaintiff shall appear at 8:30 a.m., anddefendant shall appear at 9:00 a.m. Confidential ENE statements shall be due nolater than 4:00 p.m. 9/9/19. All other instructions within the original Order SettingEarly Neutral Evaluation (ECF No. #13 ) shall remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 29, 2019 Filing 14 First STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) Early Neutral Evaluation Session by Defendant Great Basin Water Co.. (Lane, Dora)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation session has been scheduled to commence Thursday, 9/12/2019. Plaintiff must report to Magistrate Judge Weksler's chambers, Room 3071, Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Las Vegas, Nevada, at 8:30 a.m. Defendant must report to Magistrate Judge Weksler's chambers at 9:00 a.m. The ENE statements shall be submitted to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in a sealed envelope marked confidential, no later than 4:00 p.m., 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Great Basin Water Co. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Corix Regulated Utilities (US) Inc. for Great Basin Water Co. added. (Lane, Dora)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, and Jury Demand filed by Great Basin Water Co.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/2/2019.(Lane, Dora) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #1 Complaint. Great Basin Water Co. Answer due 7/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/1/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #6 Stipulation by Defendant Great Basin Water Co.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Lane, Dora)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #6 . The case number is deficient. Counsel is advised to correct the case number to 2:19-cv-01001-JCM-NJK and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #6 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #6 . Attorney S. Jordan Walsh is advised to review and update his/her user account information. ECF No. #6 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b). Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (DKJ)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 VIEW #9 corrected image re STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint by Defendant Great Basin Water Co.. (Lane, Dora) Modified on 6/28/2019 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d) (DKJ).
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Boskovich re #1 Complaint,, #4 Summons Issued. Great Basin Water Co. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/4/2019. (Foley, Jenny)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Great Basin Water Co. re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JQC)
June 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ronald Boskovich. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against Great Basin Water Co. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5584732) by Ronald Boskovich. Proof of service due by 9/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to be issued)(Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boskovich v. Great Basin Water Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Boskovich
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Represented By: Marta D. Kurshumova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Basin Water Co.
Represented By: Dora V. Lane
Represented By: S. Jordan Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?