IJL Midwest Milwaukee, LLC et al v. It's Just Lunch International, LLC
Plaintiff: Sara Darling and IJL Midwest Milwaukee, LLC
Defendant: It's Just Lunch International, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01006
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01006-APG-EJY. (no image attached) (ADR)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Defendant It's Just Lunch International, LLC. (Braster, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #17 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frank A Reino and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jennifer L Braster. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/28/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey Zucker and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jennifer Braster. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/28/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Zucker and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer L. Braster (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5605642) by Defendant It's Just Lunch International, LLC. (Braster, Jennifer)
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Frank A. Reino and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jennifer L. Braster (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5605602) by Defendant It's Just Lunch International, LLC. (Braster, Jennifer)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant It's Just Lunch International, LLC. (Braster, Jennifer)
June 27, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant It's Just Lunch International, LLC. (Braster, Jennifer)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John D Holland for IJL Midwest Milwaukee, LLC and Sara Darling and approving Designation of Local Counsel Robert W. Hernquist. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/25/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Sara Darling, IJL Midwest Milwaukee, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hernquist, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/24/2019. Re: #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition does not comply with LR 1A 11-2(a). Certificate of Good Standing is missing from the petition. Local counsel is advised to refile the petition with the court under event "Notice of Corrected Image" linking to #9 by 7/8/2019. Failure to comply will result in denial of the petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #9 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiffs Sara Darling, IJL Midwest Milwaukee, LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hernquist, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Violation of Local Rule LR IA 10-2. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #9 . Incorrect case number on document. The correct case number is 2:19-cv-01006-APG-GWF. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #9 . (no image attached) (MMM)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 VIEW #13 corrected image to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by John D. Holland and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert Hernquist (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5597459) by Plaintiffs Sara Darling, IJL Midwest Milwaukee, LLC. (Hernquist, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation; It's Just Lunch International, LLC answer due 8/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Sara Darling, IJL Midwest Milwaukee, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate John Peterson, Other Affiliate George Johnson, Other Affiliate Susan Johnson, Other Affiliate Proprietor's Capital Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Scott Evert, Other Affiliate Michael Egan, Other Affiliate William Flis, Other Affiliate Joseph Jenniges, Other Affiliate Red Oaks, Inc., Other Affiliate William McGuigan, Other Affiliate Thomas Tagtmeyer, Other Affiliate Jon Wensman, Other Affiliate Anthony Starr, Other Affiliate Pamela Burkley, Other Affiliate Al Hatfield, Other Affiliate William Peppler, Other Affiliate George Schwab for IJL Midwest Milwaukee, LLC, Sara Darling added. (Hernquist, Robert)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant It's Just Lunch International, LLC. (Braster, Jennifer)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeffrey Zucker to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/28/2019. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 13, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel John D Holland and Frank A Reino to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/28/2019. (no image attached) (ADR)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/13/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/28/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by It's Just Lunch International, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Its Just Lunch Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate IJL Holding Company, Other Affiliate IJL Chas Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Irene La Cota for It's Just Lunch International, LLC added. (Braster, Jennifer)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-794894-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5585405) by It's Just Lunch International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Braster, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IJL Midwest Milwaukee, LLC et al v. It's Just Lunch International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sara Darling
Represented By: Matthew J. Kreutzer
Represented By: John D. Holland
Represented By: Robert W. Hernquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IJL Midwest Milwaukee, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J. Kreutzer
Represented By: John D. Holland
Represented By: Robert W. Hernquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: It's Just Lunch International, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L Braster
Represented By: Jeffrey Zucker
Represented By: Frank A Reino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?