Orr et al v. Freeman et al
Plaintiff: Brandon J. Orr and Jancie Perry
Defendant: Robert Irvine, Hardison, Deputy Chief Michelle Freeman and Dr Mapleton
Case Number: 2:2019cv01012
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
2 Judge: Carl W Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 8/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01012-JAD-DJA. (no image attached) (ADR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #2 Advisory Letter Pro Se non-habeas addressed to Brandon Orr. No New Address - Did Not Resend (JM)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Payment of filing fees or IFP due within 30 days from date of this order. Complaint with Signatures and Updated Mailing Address due within 30 days from date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/18/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP, Complaint to P - JM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon J. Orr. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(JM)
June 13, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orr et al v. Freeman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Irvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hardison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Chief Michelle Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr Mapleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon J. Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jancie Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?