Thomas et al v. Dade et al

Plaintiff: Kristin Woods and Deshun Thomas
Defendant: Pat Skorkowsky, Clark County School District, Patricia Schultz, Beverly Dade and Richard Fuller
Case Number: 2:2019cv01019
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #33 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #19 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 8/16/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 9, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller.(Herrera, Crystal)
August 9, 2019 Filing 37 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #33 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. (no image attached) (EDS)
August 9, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #30 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 2/17/2020. Motions due by 3/18/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #28 Stipulation; Re: #1 Petition for Removal, Responses due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 8/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified link on 8/9/2019 (JM).
August 8, 2019 Filing 33 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to file reply in support of #19 motion to dismiss by Defendants Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller, Patricia Schultz, Pat Skorkowsky. (Herrera, Crystal) Modified to unterminate on 8/9/2019 (JM). Modified to link to motion on 8/9/2019 (EDS).
August 7, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #29 Response by Plaintiff Deshun Thomas. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hauf, Marjorie)
August 6, 2019 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #29 . Document not signed. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #29 . (no image attached) (MMM)
August 5, 2019 Filing 30 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Deshun Thomas (Hauf, Marjorie)
August 2, 2019 Filing 29 VIEW Corrected Image #32 as to RESPONSE to #19 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Deshun Thomas, Kristin Woods. Replies due by 8/9/2019. (Hauf, Marjorie) Modified on 8/8/2019 (RFJ).
August 2, 2019 Filing 28 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Petition for Removal by Defendants Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller. (Herrera, Crystal) Modified on 8/6/2019 (MMM).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting #24 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Deadline Re: #19 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 29, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #24 Stipulation by Plaintiff Deshun Thomas. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hauf, Marjorie)
July 29, 2019 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #24 . Page two (2) of the signature for Defendant is not dated. Counsel is advised to correct the deficiency and file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #24 . (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 VIEW #26 corrected image re First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #19 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Deshun Thomas. (Hauf, Marjorie)
July 23, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motions Hearing held on 7/23/2019 before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. Crtrm Administrator: Danielle Cacciabaudo; Pla Counsel: Adam Ganz, Suzanne Carver; Def Counsel: Crystal Herrera; Court Reporter: Amber McClane; Time of Hearing: 2:05 p.m. - 2:35 p.m.; Courtroom: 6D; The court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel. As stated on the record, the court GRANTS the motion to dismiss #6 and DENIES the motion for leave to file an amended complaint #16 . Court adjourns. The minutes of this proceeding and the transcript will serve as the court's official ruling. No separate written order will be issued. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2019 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendants Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller, Patricia Schultz, Pat Skorkowsky. (Herrera, Crystal)
July 15, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Patricia Schultz, Pat Skorkowsky. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Herrera, Crystal)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Patricia Schultz, Pat Skorkowsky. Responses due by 7/29/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/29/2019. (Herrera, Crystal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of consent to removal by Patricia Schultz, Pat Skorkowsky. (Herrera, Crystal)
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller. (Herrera, Crystal)
July 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint re #15 Response by Plaintiffs Deshun Thomas, Kristin Woods. (Hauf, Marjorie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiffs Deshun Thomas, Kristin Woods. Replies due by 7/12/2019. (Hauf, Marjorie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #13 Notice of Corrected Image/Document. Document was not filed pursuant to ecf. 12. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #13 as a Stipulation, pursuant to ecf. 12. (no image attached) (EDS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Stipulation by Plaintiff Deshun Thomas. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Hauf, Marjorie)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/3/2019. Re #11 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Time. The parties have stipulated to extend response and reply deadlines #11 for the motion to dismiss #6 . LR IA 6-1 requires the parties to state the reasons for the extension requested. This stipulation lacks this information, stating in conclusory fashion simply that the request is made for good cause. #11 Accordingly, the stipulation #11 is DENIED without prejudice to the filing of a new stipulation that complies with the rules of this court and explains the actual reason that the extensions are needed so that the court can determine if good cause in fact exists to approve the stipulation.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #6 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Deshun Thomas. (Hauf, Marjorie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Deshun Thomas. (Hauf, Marjorie)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller. (Herrera, Crystal) Modified filer on 6/28/2019 (JM).
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Setting Hearing on #6 MOTION to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2019 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 6D before Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (no image attached) (DC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Beverly Dade. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Herrera, Crystal)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Clark County School District, Beverly Dade, Richard Fuller. Responses due by 7/5/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/5/2019. (Herrera, Crystal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-794002-C, by Richard Fuller, Clark County School District, Beverly Dade. No changes to parties. (Herrera, Crystal)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/14/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/29/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 14, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (SLD)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:19-cv-00282-APG-PAL by Defendants Clark County School District, Richard Fuller. (Herrera, Crystal)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Clark County School District, Richard Fuller. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Herrera, Crystal)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-794002-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5587841) by Richard Fuller, Clark County School District. Proof of service due by 7/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Herrera, Crystal) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas et al v. Dade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Skorkowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: Crystal J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Dade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Fuller
Represented By: Crystal J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristin Woods
Represented By: John C. Funk
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deshun Thomas
Represented By: John C. Funk
Represented By: Marjorie L. Hauf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?