Melfiteno v. McCormick & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Pamela Melfiteno
Defendant: McCormick & Company, Inc. and Simply Asia Thai Kitchen
Case Number: 2:2019cv01026
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: James C Mahan
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 Document terminated as entered in error by Clerk's Office. CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 7/26/2019 (MMM).
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that #8 Melfiteno's motion to remand be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter of Melfiteno v. McCormick & Co., Inc. et al., case number 2:19-cv-01026-JCM-BNW, be and the same hereby is, REMANDED. The clerk shall close the case accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: CC: Certified Copy of Order and Docket Sheet Sent to State Court - ADR) Modified on 7/26/2019 to add "cc" (ADR).
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report by 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 18, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Pamela Melfiteno. (Anderson, Jared)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filers' account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #10 . Attorneys David J. Churchill and Jared B. Anderson are advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
July 8, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendant McCormick & Company, Inc.. Replies due by 7/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit - Modified on 7/9/2019 to restrict access pursuant to LR IC 6-1 (MMM), #3 Exhibit) (Foremaster, Steven)
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pamela Melfiteno. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Anderson, Jared)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that counsel for plaintiff shall have until 7/17/2019 to comply with the provisions of Local Rule 7.1-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court re #3 Errata, #1 Petition for Removal, by Plaintiff Pamela Melfiteno. Responses due by 7/8/2019. (Anderson, Jared)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF Nos. #5 and #6 were not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Cory Eichelberger and Steven Foremaster. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant McCormick & Company, Inc.. (Eichelberger, Cory)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by McCormick & Company, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Eichelberger, Cory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 6/17/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/2/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 ERRATA to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant McCormick & Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Eichelberger, Cory)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE of Violation of Federal Rule 28:1446. Attorney Action Required re: #1 Petition for Removal. ERROR: Documents missing re: #1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL as required by 28:1446(a). CORRECTION: Attorney Cory Eichelberger is advised to file the Complaint, Summons and Answer from the State Court case using the event Errata in accordance with Federal Rule 28:1446(a) and LR IC 2-2(c). Additionally, attorney advised to properly link newly filed Errata to #1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL, pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Attorney is advised until such time that the documents are filed in accordance with the federal rules of civil procedure no Judges will be assigned. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Case Number A-19-794469-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5588766) by McCormick & Company, Inc.. (Eichelberger, Cory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melfiteno v. McCormick & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Melfiteno
Represented By: Jared B Anderson
Represented By: David J. Churchill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCormick & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Cory Eichelberger
Represented By: Steven L. Foremaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simply Asia Thai Kitchen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?