Houston Hall v. Badger Construction
Plaintiff: Reginald Houston Hall
Defendant: Badger Construction
Case Number: 2:2019cv01028
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case for Early Neutral Evaluation. (no image attached) (AF)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reginald Houston Hall re #4 Summons Issued, #1 Complaint,,. Badger Construction served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. (Foley, Jenny)
June 18, 2019 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Badger Construction re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (ADR)
June 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Reginald Houston Hall. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Foley, Jenny)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against Badger Construction, A Domestic Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5589124) by Reginald Houston Hall. Proof of service due by 9/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to be issued)(Foley, Jenny) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Hall v. Badger Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Houston Hall
Represented By: Jenny L Foley
Represented By: Marta D. Kurshumova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badger Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?