Wilgar v. OPM Las Vegas Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Shana Wilgar
Defendant: OPM Las Vegas Corporation d/b/a Oishi's Property Management, a Nevada Corporation, Lawrence Oishi, OPM Las Vegas Corporation and Jeanne Kaneda
Case Number: 2:2019cv01036
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to #12 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Jeanne Kaneda, OPM Las Vegas Corporation, Lawrence Oishi. (Wolff, Jordan)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Jeanne Kaneda, OPM Las Vegas Corporation, Lawrence Oishi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Wolff, Jordan)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE that due to the retirement of U.S. Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr., this case is reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01036-RFB-EJY. (no image attached) (ADR)
August 8, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Shana Wilgar. Replies due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
August 8, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Shana Wilgar. Replies due by 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5) (Brookhyser, Amanda)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Motion by Defendants Jeanne Kaneda, OPM Las Vegas Corporation, Lawrence Oishi. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wolff, Jordan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss #6 Amended Complaint by Defendants Jeanne Kaneda, OPM Las Vegas Corporation, Lawrence Oishi. Responses due by 8/8/2019. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 VIEW #13 corrected image to MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to NRS 41.660 re #6 Amended Complaint by Defendants Jeanne Kaneda, OPM Las Vegas Corporation, Lawrence Oishi. Responses due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wolff, Jordan) Modified event on 7/26/2019 (MMM).
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Jeanne Kaneda, OPM Las Vegas Corporation, Lawrence Oishi. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shana Wilgar. Jeanne Kaneda served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Jeanne Kaneda. (JM)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Shana Wilgar. (Brookhyser, Amanda)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Shana Wilgar by Shana Wilgar. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 10/10/2019.(Brookhyser, Amanda) Modified to add Defendant Jeanne Kaneda on 7/15/2019 (SLD).
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants OPM Las Vegas Corporation, Lawrence Oishi. (Wolff, Jordan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by OPM Las Vegas Corporation, Lawrence Oishi. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wolff, Jordan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #1 . Attorney Amanda J. Brookhyser is advised to review and update her user account information. (no image attached) (MMM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/18/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 7/3/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. (ADR)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court of Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-795410-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5590529) by Lawrence Oishi, OPM Las Vegas Corporation d/b/a Oishi's Property Management, a Nevada Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolff, Jordan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilgar v. OPM Las Vegas Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Wilgar
Represented By: James Joseph Jimmerson
Represented By: Amanda Brookhyser
Represented By: James M. Jimmerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPM Las Vegas Corporation d/b/a Oishi's Property Management, a Nevada Corporation
Represented By: Jordan Danforth Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Oishi
Represented By: Jordan Danforth Wolff
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OPM Las Vegas Corporation
Represented By: Jordan Danforth Wolff
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Kaneda
Represented By: Jordan Danforth Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?