Welch v. Minev et al
Plaintiff: Kentrell D Welch
Defendant: Jennifer Nash, Michael Minev, Tito Buencamino, G Bryant, Brian Williams and James Dzurenda
Case Number: 2:2019cv01064
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Kentrell D Welch. Proof of service due by 11/4/2019.(SLD)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that a decision on Plaintiff's #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Deferred. The Clerk of the Court shall file the #1 -1 complaint and send Plaintiff a courtesy copy. The complaint is dismissed in its entirety, without prejudice, with leave to amend.The #2 and #4 Motions for Preliminary Injunction and #5 Motion for TRO are Denied without prejudice. Amended Complaint deadline: 9/5/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/6/2019. (copy of complaint sent to P)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - prisoner instructions/Complaint form mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, by Plaintiff Kentrell D Welch. (MR)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Second Request), by Plaintiff Kentrell D Welch. Responses due by 8/8/2019. (MR)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (SLD)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Kentrell D Welch. Responses due by 7/3/2019.(SLD)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kentrell D Welch. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons)(SLD)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Minev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Minev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tito Buencamino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentrell D Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?